Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Funez, Edward, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Kerley, John Edward, against American Contractors Indemnity Company, Benevento'S Cleaning & Restoration Inc., Fire Insurance Exchange, represented by Antoniou, Alexi P, Ferber, Michelle R, Kohls, Daniel V., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Hamilton, Jeffrey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHamilton, Jeffrey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management127 days |
Filing DateJanuary 01, 1900 |
Category07 Unlimited - Business Tort/Unfair Business Practice |
Time To Trial552 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed by Edward Funez against Fire Insurance Exchange, Benevento's Cleaning & Restoration Service Inc. dba Service Master by Benevento, American Contractors Indemnity Company, and Does I through 20. The complaint al...
Stipulation and Order filed
Date: November 19, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: November 13, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 21, 2019Civil Complaint filed
Date: July 30, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 15, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 19, 2019Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 21, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 21, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 21, 2020Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 30, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 21, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: February 16, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: February 22, 2021Order filed
Date: February 22, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: February 22, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: February 22, 2021Opposition filed
Date: May 03, 2021Reply filed
Date: May 06, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: November 17, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: November 17, 2021Order filed
Date: November 29, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: July 30, 2019Summons issued and filed
Date: July 31, 2019Answer Filed
Date: September 18, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 31, 2019Notice Filed
Date: November 19, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: November 19, 2019Answer Filed
Date: October 08, 2019ADR Report filed.
Date: December 16, 2020Deposit, payment,disbursment
Date: September 23, 2019ADR Report filed.
Date: December 15, 2020Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing
Date: November 18, 2019Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 29, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: February 19, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: November 12, 2021Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: December 08, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: June 09, 2022Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: June 20, 2022Order Granted
Date: June 21, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: May 06, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 22, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 12, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: January 26, 2021Order Granted
Date: January 06, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 05, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial 5-14 days est. Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing OST - MPO ~ Paul Peters Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Hearing MCT ~ Paul Peters Judge: Culver Kapetan, Kristi |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
7/13/22 Proposed Order re ex parte MCT HRG 7/14/22 Order Received for Signature PENDING HEARING [Proposed] Order Shortening Time to Hear Motion to Continue Trial |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
7/13/22 Brydon Dec re Ex parte MCT HRG 7/14/22 Declaration Filed Declaration of John Brydon ISO Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Trial Due to Trial Counsel's Unavailability |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
7/13/2 Koberlein Dec HRG 7/14/22 Declaration Filed Declaration of Leighton Koberlein re Plaintiff's Four Notices of Depositions of Defendant Fire Insurance's PMQ with Production of Documents |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
7/13/22 Peters Dec re Ex parte MCT HRG 7/14/22 Declaration Filed Declaration of Paul Peters ISO Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Trial |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
7/13/22 Ex Parte MCT/OST HRG 7/14/22 Ex parte Filed Ex Parte Application for Order to Continue Trial, or, an Order Shortening Time to Hear a Motion to Continue Trial; Memo; Declaration of Paul Peters |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.