Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Alan Labossiere Individually And As A Successor I Interest To Thelma Lobossiere, Annette Leitzke Individually And As A Successor In Interest To Thelma Labossiere, Estate Of Labossiere By And Through Its Successors In Interest Alan Labossiere And Annette Leizke, Braille Institute Of America Inc. A Corporation, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Wallace Bradley Stuart Esq., against Braille Institute Of America Inc. A Corporation, represented by Smith Timothy Mark Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Serena R. Murillo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSerena R. Murillo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 12, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Ruling on Submitted Matter)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For An Order to C...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discove...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment, Or In The Alternative...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-07-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of the Hearing on Def...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Continuance of the Hearing on Def...) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00PI General Order Filed by Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Prohibitin...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion to compel Plaintiff's responses to Special Interrogatories, set one)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00PI General Order
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-12-05T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion to Compel Plaintiff's responses to Request for Production, set one)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-05-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion to Compel Plaintiff's responses to Form Interrogatories, set one)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-11-13T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2020-01-24T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order], Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates)
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Declaration (ARATIONS OF ALAN LABOSSIERE AND ANNETTE LEITZKE)
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00Memorandum (ISO Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' responses to Requests for Admission, set one)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Memorandum (ISO Motion to Compel Plaintiff's responses to Form Interrogatories, set one)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2020-01-28T00:00:00Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-08-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Continuance of the 06/02/2020 Hearing on Def...))
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Declaration (ISO Motion to Compel Plaintiffs' responses to Requests for Admission, set one)
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Declaration (OF TIMOTHY M. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Declaration (OF *PETER A. MINDNICH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Brief (Plaintiffs' separately bound evidence in opposition to motion)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Declaration (In Suppoprt of Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Defendant's Motion for Protective Order Prohibitin...))
Date: 2021-04-22T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Nunc Pro Tunc Order))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2020-08-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-11-04T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2021-01-22T00:00:00Opposition (Plaintiffs' opposition to motion for summary judgment/adjudication)
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Response (TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT)
Date: 2021-02-16T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2021-01-28T00:00:00Declaration (OF ANTHONY JOJI TAKETA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER)
Date: 2020-11-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (- Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discove...))
Date: 2020-08-21T00:00:00in Department 29, Serena R. Murillo, Presiding
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-06-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2021-03-25T00:00:00Notice of Ruling (Re Defendant's Motion for Protective Order)
Date: 2021-04-26T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2021-04-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Plaintiff's Ex Parte Application For An Order to C...))
Date: 2021-02-17T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Separate Statement
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Continuance of the Hearing on Def...) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-29T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-12T00:00:00PI General Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-12-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2021-11-12T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 12, 2019Complaint
Date: November 12, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 12, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION ARATIONS OF ALAN LABOSSIERE AND ANNETTE LEITZKE
Date: November 12, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 12, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 13, 2019PI General Order
Date: December 04, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: December 05, 2019Answer
Date: January 24, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: January 28, 2020Cross-Complaint
Date: January 28, 2020Separate Statement
Date: April 27, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: April 27, 2020Amendment to Cross-Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: August 07, 2020Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 26, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF TIMOTHY M. SMITH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 09, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: November 04, 2020Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 09, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF ANTHONY JOJI TAKETA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 09, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION OF *PETER A. MINDNICH IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: November 09, 2020Separate Statement
Date: January 22, 2021Motion for Protective Order
Date: November 09, 2020Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPOPRT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 22, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 22, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: January 22, 2021Response - RESPONSE TO EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: February 16, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER TO C...)
Date: February 17, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NUNC PRO TUNC ORDER)
Date: February 17, 2021Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: March 25, 2021Notice of Ruling - NOTICE OF RULING RE DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: April 26, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 28, 2021Separate Statement
Date: April 28, 2021Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: May 20, 2021Separate Statement
Date: June 28, 2021Brief - BRIEF PLAINTIFFS' SEPARATELY BOUND EVIDENCE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 28, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (RULING ON SUBMITTED MATTER)
Date: September 16, 2021Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: September 28, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: November 10, 2021Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: November 12, 2021Request for Dismissal
Date: December 06, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: December 27, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.