Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sanders Nancy, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Howell Jonathan E. Esq., against Interinsurance Exchange Of The Automobile Club, Novoa Paul, represented by Balmuth Matthew W. Esq., in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Richard J. Burdge Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard J. Burdge Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management262 days |
Filing DateOctober 21, 2019 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions262 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time282 days |
Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: Nancy Sanders (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Opposition PF's Opp to Def's Demurrer (07.09.20); Filed by: Nancy Sanders (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (In Chambers Court Order) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Case Management Conference]; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Related Case; Filed by: Nancy Sanders (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Opposition PF's Opp to Def's MTN to Strike (07.09.20); Filed by: Nancy Sanders (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Nancy Sanders (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: November 01, 2019Request for Judicial Notice
Date: January 03, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: January 03, 2020Motion re: - MOTION RE: TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES IN PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT
Date: January 03, 2020Notice of Related Case
Date: January 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS COURT ORDER)
Date: January 21, 2020Amended Complaint
Date: March 02, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF TAKING DEFENDANTS’ DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR
Date: March 03, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 06, 2020Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: April 06, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: April 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: April 17, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: April 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: April 23, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PF'S OPP TO DEF'S MTN TO STRIKE (07.09.20)
Date: June 24, 2020Opposition - OPPOSITION PF'S OPP TO DEF'S DEMURRER (07.09.20)
Date: June 24, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 24, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: July 29, 2020Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NOT ENTERED
Date: January 20, 2023Minute Order ( (In Chambers Court Order))
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice (OF TAKING DEFENDANTS? DEMURRER AND MOTION TO STRIKE OFF CALENDAR)
Date: 2020-03-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-04-17T00:00:00Motion re: (MOTION AND MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF PLAINTIFF?S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Notice of Case Management Conference])
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-11-01T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Opposition (PF's Opp to Def's MTN to Strike (07.09.20))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/23/2020)
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Amended Complaint
Date: 2020-03-02T00:00:00Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Related Case
Date: 2020-01-16T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Motion re: (TO STRIKE PUNITIVE DAMAGES IN PLAINTIFF?S COMPLAINT)
Date: 2020-01-03T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice (PLAINTIFF NANCY SANDERS'S REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE)
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-13T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((In Chambers Court Order) of 01/21/2020)
Date: 2020-01-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-07-29T00:00:00Opposition (PF's Opp to Def's Demurrer (07.09.20))
Date: 2020-06-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Hearing on Demurrer - with Motion...))
Date: 2020-07-09T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2020-04-23T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.