Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Sanders Brian, filed a(n) Writ - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) case represented by Borchert Brent, against Santa Monica Police Department, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with Mary H. Strobel presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateOctober 15, 2019 |
CategoryWrit - Administrative Mandamus (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
||
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
||
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time94 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 15, 2019Complaint
Date: October 15, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2019Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: October 16, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 16, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: January 17, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: October 16, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: January 17, 2020Answer
Date: December 09, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Trial Setting Conference and Attached Orders Thereon
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2019-10-15T00:00:00Answer
Date: December 09, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: January 17, 2020Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: 2019-10-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW))
Date: January 17, 2020For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.