Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Kingdom Of Sweden, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Koltai Mikael, Mooney W. Ernest, against Mengesha Daniel Michael, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Santa Monica with Mark A. Young presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark A. Young Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 17, 2019 |
CategoryOther Promissory Note/Collections Case (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Monica |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time334 days |
Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 17, 2019Complaint (for Breach of Contract and Common Counts)
Date: October 17, 2019Certificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kingdom of Sweden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Kingdom of Sweden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Appearance Case Review) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Default entered as to Daniel Michael Mengesha; On the Complaint filed by Kingdom of Sweden on
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice; Filed by: Kingdom of Sweden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Default entered as to Daniel Michael Mengesha; On the Complaint filed by Kingdom of Sweden on
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: W. Ernest Mooney (Attorney)
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Updated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Kingdom of Sweden (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date:
Date: 2020-09-15T00:00:00Case Management Statement; Filed by: Kingdom of Sweden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Summary of the Case; Filed by: Kingdom of Sweden (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: October 17, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 17, 2019Complaint - COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT AND COMMON COUNTS
Date: October 17, 2019Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: October 21, 2019Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 01, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: April 01, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: April 06, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: April 14, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW)
Date: April 15, 2020Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 16, 2020Unknown - NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE DUE TO COVID-19 STATE OF EMERGENCY DECLARATIONS
Date: April 27, 2020Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: April 16, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: April 27, 2020Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: May 05, 2020Summary of the Case
Date: May 28, 2020Request for Dismissal
Date: May 28, 2020Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: July 13, 2020Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: October 07, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: September 08, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR APPEARANCE AND EXAMINATION)
Date: November 12, 2020Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: February 18, 2021Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: February 18, 2021Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: April 05, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 07, 2021Proof of Personal Service
Date: June 07, 2021Summons (on Complaint)
Date: October 17, 2019Certificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 04/14/2020)
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review))
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2019-10-17T00:00:00Notice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference))
Date: 2020-04-14T00:00:00Summary of the Case
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-04-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-04-16T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations
Date: 2020-04-27T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2019-10-21T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review) of 04/15/2020)
Date: 2020-04-15T00:00:00Notice (OF CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)
Date: 2020-04-06T00:00:00Default Judgment
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: 2020-05-05T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2021-04-05T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2020-10-07T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2020-09-08T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examinati...))
Date: 2021-03-30T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Application and Order for Appearance and Examination
Date: 2021-02-18T00:00:00Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order
Date: 2020-07-13T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice
Date: 2020-05-28T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination))
Date: 2020-11-12T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.