Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Griffiths Precious, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Cischke Steven M. Esq., against Mason John J. Dba Brightstar Healthcare And Brightstar Care, Valleystar Inc., represented by Soltman Steven B, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk Courthouse with William F. Fahey presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management120 days |
|
Filing DateNovember 19, 2018 |
CategoryWrongful Termination (General Jurisdiction) |
|
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Case Cycle Time350 days |
Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: November 19, 2018Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT
Date: November 19, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 19, 2018Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: November 27, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference -
Date: November 27, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)
Date: January 22, 2019Answer - Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint
Date: February 19, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: February 20, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 04, 2019Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: March 06, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: March 06, 2019Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: March 14, 2019Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: March 14, 2019Case Management Order
Date: March 19, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: April 19, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER (PROTECTIVE) RE: DISCOVERY
Date: May 07, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUE POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE
Date: August 09, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)
Date: August 09, 2019Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 08/09/2019
Date: August 09, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: September 16, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (POST-MEDIATION STATUS CONFERENCE)
Date: September 17, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: September 18, 2019Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT
Date: September 19, 2019Motion for Order - MOTION FOR ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT
Date: September 23, 2019Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: October 07, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: October 22, 2019Notice of Ruling
Date: October 25, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON EX PARTE APPLICATION TO APPROVE PAGA SETTLEMENT)
Date: October 28, 2019Ex Parte Application - EX PARTE APPLICATION TO APPROVE PAGA SETTLEMENT
Date: October 28, 2019Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT)
Date: November 04, 2019Order - ORDER APPROVING PAGA SETTLEMENT
Date: November 04, 2019Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-11-19T00:00:00Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-09-16T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...))
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Order Approving PAGA Settlement))
Date: November 04, 2019Notice of Settlement
Date: 2019-10-22T00:00:00Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-04T00:00:00Order (Approving PAGA Settlement)
Date: November 04, 2019Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 08/09/2019)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-03-18T00:00:00Stipulation and Order ((Protective) Re: Discovery)
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Ex Parte Application (To Approve PAGA Settlement)
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-04-19T00:00:00Answer (to Plaintiff's Complaint)
Date: 2019-02-19T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ([Stipulation and Order (Protective) Re: Discovery])
Date: 2019-05-07T00:00:00Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: 2019-10-07T00:00:00Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: 2018-11-27T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Approve PAGA Settlement))
Date: 2019-10-28T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-09-18T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2019-10-25T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Order Approving PAGA Settlement) of 11/04/2019)
Date: November 04, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: 2019-03-06T00:00:00Motion for Order (Approving PAGA Settlement)
Date: 2019-09-19T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (Continue Post-Mediation Status Conference)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order))
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service))
Date: 2019-01-22T00:00:00Declaration re: Due Diligence
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Case Management Order
Date: 2019-03-19T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Post-Mediation Status Conference))
Date: 2019-09-17T00:00:00Motion for Order (Approving PAGA Settlement)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Final Status Conference; Mandatory Settlement Conference (MSC)))
Date: 2019-10-31T00:00:00Notice of Ruling ((APPROVING SETTLEMENT))
Date: November 06, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-03-14T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Order Approving PAGA Settlement; Order ...))
Date: 2019-10-11T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.