Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Beta Healthcare Group, Cedars-Sinai Medical Center, City Of Los Angeles, Sp Plus Corporation, Sahagen Rosette, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Eslamboly-Hakim Sharona, against City Of Los Angeles, City Of West Hollywood, County Of Los Angeles, Sp Plus Corporation, Swinerton Builders Doe 1, (total of 8) See All represented by Anderson Kevin Clifford, Haith Scott, Kaftern Timothy, Neumann Katrina N., Newcomb Mark, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Spring Street Courthouse with Jon R. Takasugi presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJon R. Takasugi Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions297 days |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
|
Filing Court HouseSpring Street Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeUnknown Disposition |
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 30, 2018Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: October 31, 2018Summons - Summons on Complaint
Date: October 30, 2018Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: April 25, 2019Answer - ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: May 20, 2019Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF MEGAN BARNETT
Date: May 23, 2019Proof of Personal Service
Date: May 30, 2019Amended Complaint - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: May 31, 2019Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT
Date: June 03, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: June 03, 2019Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: June 03, 2019Answer
Date: June 03, 2019Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: July 08, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: July 15, 2019Request for Dismissal
Date: July 19, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: August 06, 2019Answer
Date: August 06, 2019Amended Complaint
Date: August 09, 2019Summons - SUMMONS ON CROSS COMPLAINT
Date: August 13, 2019Cross-Complaint
Date: August 13, 2019Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: August 21, 2019Order - ORDER BY THE COURT DISMISSING CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD PURSUANT TO STIPULATION
Date: August 23, 2019Answer
Date: August 20, 2019Answer
Date: September 06, 2019Answer
Date: September 11, 2019Answer
Date: September 13, 2019Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: September 26, 2019Substitution of Attorney
Date: October 03, 2019Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: May 20, 2020Complaint in Intervention
Date: June 12, 2020Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT (2ND)
Date: June 12, 2020Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: July 07, 2020Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: September 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE MOTION OF BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP TO INTERVENE;)
Date: September 16, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)
Date: October 28, 2020Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: October 28, 2020Notice - NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE IN PLAINTIFF'S ACTION
Date: September 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RESCHEDULING HEARINGS DUE TO EMERGENCY ORDERS RE:...)
Date: September 17, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE)
Date: November 13, 2020Notice of Ruling
Date: November 16, 2020Complaint in Intervention
Date: November 18, 2020Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)
Date: December 01, 2020Complaint in Intervention - COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION AMENDED (1ST)
Date: December 02, 2020Answer
Date: January 08, 2021Substitution of Attorney
Date: February 24, 2021Notice - NOTICE INTRA OFFICE TRANSFER
Date: March 03, 2021Notice of Change of Handling Attorney
Date: March 14, 2022Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: December 17, 2021Notice of Settlement
Date: April 19, 2022Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT)
Date: May 27, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: June 22, 2022Request for Dismissal - AS TO COMPLAINT - NO ENTERED - AS THERE ARE PENDING XCS
Date: July 06, 2022Notice - NOTICE OF FURTHER HEARING FOR OSC RE: DISMISSAL
Date: July 22, 2022Request for Dismissal
Date: August 08, 2022Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service
Date: August 29, 2022Answer; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant); As to: Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff); As to: County of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Answer to Complaint; Filed by: SP Plus Corporation (Defendant); As to: Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SP Plus Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury; Filed by: Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by: Eric Jeffrey Wayne (Attorney)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Summons on Complaint (2nd); Issued and Filed by: Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff); As to: City of West Hollywood (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: SP Plus Corporation (Cross-Complainant); As to: Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: SP Plus Corporation (Cross-Defendant); As to: City of Los Angeles (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement; Filed by: Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff); Vacate Future Dates: No
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: City of Los Angeles (Cross-Defendant); As to: SP Plus Corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: Swinerton Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike; Filed by: The Taubman Company, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: SP Plus Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Complaint Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by Swinerton Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Complaint (2nd) Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint) Filed by SP Plus Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Complaint (1st) Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Answer Filed by SP Plus Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint) Filed by SP Plus Corporation (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by City of Los Angeles (Defendant)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by City of Los Angeles (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd) Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff); Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st) Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Cross-Complaint Filed by SP Plus Corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Declaration (of Megan Barnett) Filed by Swinerton Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike Filed by The Taubman Company, LLC (Defendant)
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees Filed by SP Plus Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-12-17T00:00:00Answer Filed by Swinerton Incorporated (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Intervene Filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: August 08, 2022Notice of Change of Handling Attorney Filed by SP Plus Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-03-14T00:00:00Notice of Settlement Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-04-19T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention Filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement) of ) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Intervene Filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) (conditional))) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by SP Plus Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by SP Plus Corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed by BETA HEALTHCARE GROUP (Plaintiff in Intervention)
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Answer Filed by City of Los Angeles (Cross-Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-12-11T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Taubman Company, LLC (Defendant); Swinerton Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for order granting to intervene;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney Filed by SP Plus Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Cross-Complaint ((DUPLICATE)) Filed by SP Plus Corporation (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (of Dismissal) Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd)) Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Answer Filed by The Taubman Company, LLC (Defendant); Swinerton Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Rescheduling Hearings due to Emergency Orders Re:...)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice (OF FURTHER HEARING FOR OSC RE: DISMISSAL) Filed by SP Plus Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2022-07-22T00:00:00Request for Dismissal Filed by City of Los Angeles (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2022-06-22T00:00:00Notice (INTRA OFFICE TRANSFER) Filed by City of Los Angeles (Cross-Complainant)
Date: 2021-03-03T00:00:00Answer Filed by Swinerton Builders (Doe 1) (Defendant)
Date: 2021-01-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information Filed by Eric Jeffrey Wayne (Attorney)
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Notice of Deposit - Jury
Date: 2019-04-25T00:00:00Answer (to Complaint)
Date: 2019-05-20T00:00:00Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case
Date: 2018-10-31T00:00:00Complaint (1st)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Declaration (of Megan Barnett)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Complaint
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint)
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)
Date: 2020-05-20T00:00:00Stipulation and Order (of Dismissal)
Date: 2019-08-21T00:00:00Notice of Posting of Jury Fees
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-11T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-06T00:00:00Summons (on Complaint (2nd))
Date: 2020-06-12T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-08-06T00:00:00Summons (Cross-Complaint)
Date: 2019-06-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: 2018-10-30T00:00:00Amended Complaint (1st)
Date: 2019-05-31T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-07-19T00:00:00Answer (CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT)
Date: 2019-06-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene))
Date: 2020-11-13T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Motion of Beta Healthcare Group to Intervene;))
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00Motion for Leave to Intervene
Date: 2020-07-07T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Rescheduling Hearings due to Emergency Orders Re:...))
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Notice (of Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene in Plaintiff's Action)
Date: 2020-09-17T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application for order granting to intervene;))
Date: 2020-07-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Intervene))
Date: 2020-10-28T00:00:00Amended Complaint (2nd)
Date: 2019-08-09T00:00:00Demurrer - without Motion to Strike
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information
Date: 2019-09-26T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-08-20T00:00:00Cross-Complaint
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Request for Dismissal
Date: 2019-07-15T00:00:00Summons (on Cross Complaint)
Date: 2019-08-13T00:00:00Order (By the Court Dismissing City of West Hollywood pursuant to stipulation)
Date: 2019-08-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney
Date: 2019-10-03T00:00:00Notice of Ruling
Date: 2020-11-16T00:00:00Complaint in Intervention
Date: 2020-11-18T00:00:00Proof of Personal Service
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00Declaration Declaration of Megan Barnett; Filed by: Swinerton Incorporated (Defendant)
Date: 2019-05-23T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: SP Plus Corporation (Defendant)
Date: 2021-02-24T00:00:00Minute Order ( (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-12-01T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re Motion of Beta Healthcare Group to Intervene;)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2020-09-16T00:00:00AS TO COMPLAINT - NO ENTERED - AS THERE ARE PENDING XCS Filed by Rosette Sahagen (Plaintiff)
Date: 2022-07-06T00:00:00Minute Order ( (Court Order Re: Notice of Settlement)) Filed by Clerk
Date: 2022-05-27T00:00:00Answer
Date: 2019-09-13T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.