Case Last Refreshed: 2 days ago
Thompson Ly, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Bryan James Mccormack, against Sage Intacct, Inc., represented by Sophia Behnia, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Cynthia C. Lie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCynthia C. Lie Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2018 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions820 days |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a class action lawsuit filed by Plaintiff Thompson Ly against defendant Sage Intacct, Inc. The complaint alleges that the defendant violated California labor laws by not paying overtime compensation and other wages to Sales Developm...
Declaration
Date: August 06, 2020Exhibit List (Party)
Date: June 05, 2020Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: November 09, 2020Declaration
Date: October 13, 2021Notice
Date: July 06, 2020Notice: Settlement
Date: April 29, 2020Declaration
Date: November 09, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 10, 2020Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil)
Date: November 12, 2021Motion: Order
Date: November 09, 2020Declaration
Date: June 05, 2020Notice
Date: August 26, 2020Motion: Preliminary Approval
Date: June 05, 2020Proof of Service
Date: November 09, 2020Notice
Date: April 29, 2020Order
Date: December 10, 2020Notice
Date: August 05, 2020Proof of Service: Mail
Date: June 05, 2020Notice
Date: April 29, 2021Declaration
Date: November 09, 2020Exhibit List (Party)
Date: June 05, 2020Declaration
Date: November 09, 2020Exhibit List (Party)
Date: June 05, 2020Declaration
Date: November 09, 2020Order
Date: August 07, 2020Proof of Service
Date: January 17, 2020Judgment
Date: November 09, 2021Minute Order
Date: October 22, 2021Minute Order
Date: August 07, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: January 29, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: January 04, 2019Conference: Case Progress
Date: August 14, 2019Conference: Case Progress
Date: November 04, 2019Motion: Preliminary Approval
Date: August 07, 2020Motion: Final Fairness Hearing
Date: December 10, 2020Conference: Case Management
Date: October 21, 2021Order
Date: November 15, 2019Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: February 25, 2020Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: January 25, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: October 28, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 27, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: September 12, 2018Proof of Service
Date: October 28, 2019Notice
Date: October 15, 2018Notice
Date: October 29, 2019Notice
Date: July 15, 2019Notice
Date: May 30, 2019Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 12, 2018Civil Lawsuit Notice
Date: September 13, 2018Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: August 14, 2019Notice
Date: October 15, 2019Notice
Date: January 07, 2019Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: September 12, 2018Declaration
Date: October 28, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: June 05, 2020Stipulation and Order
Date: April 17, 2019Order
Date: January 09, 2019Minute Order
Date: November 04, 2019Separate Statement
Date: October 28, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 05, 2021Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: August 21, 2020Minute Order
Date: June 29, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 21, 2020Request: Dismissal
Date: July 25, 2022Notice: Settlement
Date: June 02, 2022Conference: Settlement Jury
Date: June 01, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 12, 2021Conference: Case Management
Date: February 02, 2021Conference: Further Case Management
Date: June 29, 2021Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: August 21, 2020Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2021Conference: Trial Setting
Date: October 12, 2021Minute Order: Amended
Date: June 06, 2022Minute Order
Date: June 06, 2022Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: January 05, 2021Motion: Compel
Date: October 28, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: September 09, 2019Order
Date: August 14, 2019Order: Deeming Case Complex
Date: September 17, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Request: Dismissal Request for Dismissal |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order: Amended HRG: MSC 6/01/22 |
|
June 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
June 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice: Settlement | |
June 01, 2022 | Hearing | Conference: Settlement Jury | |
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Not Settled: at Mandatory Settlement Conference Not held (per settlement attorney, settled before MSC) |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Notice of Entry (Civil) Amended Final Judgment: Notice of Entry Civil |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment HRG 10/21/21 Amended Final Judgment - signed/SRK. |
|
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
October 21, 2021 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.