Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Coulombe, Julie, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Musell, Wendy Ellen, against Butte County Probation, represented by Camy, William Ernest, in the jurisdiction of Butte County. This case was filed in Butte County Superior Courts with Molly A. Bigelow presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management178 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2018 |
Category(15) Unlimited Other Employment |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
|
Filing LocationButte County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
|
Case Management Statement
Date: May 21, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: June 05, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: September 04, 2020Answer - Response - Denial - Unlimited
Date: October 09, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: August 20, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 13, 2019Notice of Reassignment
Date: October 02, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: December 17, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: May 20, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 04, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: January 03, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: August 22, 2019Complaint
Date: September 04, 2018Case Management Conference
Date: March 01, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: August 19, 2019Case Management Statement
Date: December 19, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: September 06, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: February 05, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: January 21, 2021Order
Date: December 03, 2020Case Management Conference
Date: April 02, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: March 17, 2021Minute Order
Date: September 04, 2020Judge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1
Date: September 11, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 04, 2018Proof of Service
Date: February 18, 2022Reply
Date: February 25, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 04, 2018Report
Date: February 25, 2021Returned Mail
Date: December 14, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: December 04, 2020Notice of Assignment and Case Management Conference
Date: September 05, 2018Judge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1
Date: September 13, 2018Proof of Mailing
Date: December 03, 2020Proof of Mailing
Date: February 23, 2021Judge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1
Date: September 07, 2018Returned Mail
Date: September 17, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 01, 2019Objection - No Fee
Date: February 18, 2022Request for Court Reporter
Date: March 03, 2022Objection - No Fee
Date: February 25, 2022Declaration
Date: February 18, 2022Reply
Date: February 25, 2022Reply
Date: February 25, 2022Reply
Date: February 25, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 18, 2021Minute Order
Date: March 04, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 05, 2021Amended Minute Order
Date: February 05, 2021Minute Order
Date: June 05, 2020Order
Date: October 14, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: October 21, 2021Judge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1
Date: October 01, 2018Proof of Mailing
Date: April 14, 2021Returned Mail
Date: May 22, 2020Statement
Date: October 21, 2021Judge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1
Date: September 12, 2018Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: October 21, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: October 21, 2021Notice of Returned Documents
Date: January 29, 2019Returned Mail
Date: November 19, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: December 06, 2021Judge's Recusal Per CCP 170.1
Date: September 10, 2018Substitution of Attorney
Date: August 18, 2020Minute Order
Date: April 02, 2021Notice
Date: October 02, 2018Minute Order
Date: January 03, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 06, 2019Notice of Rescheduling
Date: March 24, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 18, 2022Notice
Date: October 21, 2021Declaration
Date: October 21, 2021Proof of Mailing
Date: December 17, 2021Notice
Date: February 18, 2022Statement
Date: February 18, 2022Declaration
Date: March 22, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 16, 2022Declaration
Date: March 23, 2022Notice
Date: April 28, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 20, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: April 20, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: April 21, 2022Notice of Rescheduling
Date: March 22, 2022Order
Date: March 10, 2022Proof of Mailing
Date: March 22, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: March 17, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: May 06, 2022Ruling
Date: April 21, 2022Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 04, 2022Declaration
Date: February 25, 2022Opposition - No Fee
Date: February 18, 2022Exhibit List
Date: October 21, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduling Case Management Conference Resetting Trial Dates Judge: Bigelow, Molly |
|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Notice |
|
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Mailing | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ruling on Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Ruling Judge: Bigelow, Molly |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Julie Coulombe's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Case Management Statement Case Management Statement |
|
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Resetting Trial Dates Judge: Bigelow, Molly |
|
March 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Under Submission for Decision
Judge: Bigelow, Molly |
|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Brittany Wightman in Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, or in the Alternative Summary Adjudication |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Declaration of William E Camy regarding submitting transcription of audio exhibits in support of its motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative, summary adjudication Declaration |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.