Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jacqueline Misho, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Pro Se, against Cat Cora, Inc, Cora, Catherine Ann, represented by Friedman, David, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts Superior with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management124 days |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2018 |
CategoryUnlimited Other Collections (09) |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Management Conference
Date: August 08, 2018Notice of Case Assignment/Case Management Conf, Filed
Date: April 06, 2018Order to Show Cause, Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Order to Show Cause: Dismissal
Date: February 28, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Order to Show Cause: Fail to Appear
Date: May 09, 2022plaintiff notice of cont cmc 050922
Date: May 09, 2022Stipulation, Filed
Date: February 22, 2019Motion, Filed
Date: August 07, 2018Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: July 17, 2018Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: July 17, 2018Application for Right to Attach Order, Filed
Date: June 21, 2018Notice, Filed
Date: July 06, 2018Complaint for Damages, Filed
Date: April 06, 2018Motion, Filed
Date: July 03, 2018Opposition, Filed
Date: June 08, 2018Exhibit in Support of Pleading, Filed
Date: July 17, 2018Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: August 07, 2018notice stay misho_001
Date: July 26, 2022Case Management Conference
Date: August 01, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 01, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed
Date: April 06, 2018Summons Issued, Filed
Date: April 06, 2018Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: May 09, 2018Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed
Date: May 09, 2018Request for Entry of Default, Filed
Date: June 08, 2018Notice of Errata
Date: June 12, 2018Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: June 21, 2018Notice of Posting of Jury Fees, Filed
Date: July 27, 2018Order After Hearing, Filed
Date: August 13, 2018Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: August 14, 2018Proof of Service, Filed
Date: August 17, 2018Substitution of Attorney, Filed
Date: December 17, 2018Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed
Date: February 22, 2019Declaration, Filed
Date: February 22, 2019Mail Returned Undeliverable
Date: January 18, 2022Notice of Hearing, Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Notice, Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Notice of Stay of Proceedings, Filed
Date: July 26, 2022Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: August 02, 2022Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 06, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: January 09, 2023Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: February 07, 2023Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Minute Order, Filed
Date: January 09, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: February 06, 2023plaintiff case management stmt 081723
Date: August 17, 2023Reply, Filed
Date: July 17, 2018Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: August 16, 2018Notice of Settlement Entire Case, Filed
Date: September 06, 2018Answer/Response/Denial - Unlimited, Filed
Date: June 29, 2018Opposition, Filed
Date: July 13, 2018Motion: Set Aside
Date: August 08, 2018Minute Order, Filed
Date: July 25, 2018Minute Order, Filed
Date: August 08, 2018Order to Show Cause: Dismissal
Date: February 27, 2019Case Management Statement, Filed
Date: July 23, 2018Demurrer
Date: June 20, 2018Minute Order, Filed
Date: June 20, 2018Motion, Filed
Date: May 21, 2018Motion: Strike
Date: June 20, 2018Notice of Ruling, Filed
Date: June 20, 2018Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 27, 2019Order to Show Cause, Filed
Date: November 27, 2018Opposition, Filed
Date: June 06, 2018Demurrer, Filed
Date: May 21, 2018Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: July 06, 2020Right to Attach
Date: July 25, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | plaintiff case management stmt 081723 | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed Minute Order Dated 02/06/2023 |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC cont'd to 8/21/23; BK still pending |
|
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed Minute Order Dated 01/09/2023 |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Case Management Conference Judge: Anderle, Thomas P |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed No appear.; CMC cont'd to 2/6/23 |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing, Filed Minute Order Dated 08/01/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.