Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Darryl Ray Roberts vs Jack William, et al.
A (22): Unlimited Auto case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Merced County. Judge McCabe, Brian presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 03, 2018
Last Refreshed
January 19, 2024
Filing Location
Merced County, CA
Filing Court House
Superior
Category
(22): Unlimited Auto
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
Case Management Conference
Date: Aug 02, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Jul 14, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: Feb 05, 2021Letter
Date: Feb 02, 2021Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: Jan 25, 2021Case Management Conference
Date: Sep 09, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: Jun 17, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: Feb 11, 2019Case Management Conference
Date: Dec 03, 2018Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Notice of Settlement
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Notice of Settlement Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
October 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Notice of Settlement Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
October 18, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 18CV-02641 Darryl Ray Roberts v. Jack William, et al. Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Status of Settlement Appearance required. Remote appearances are strongly encouraged. To arrange a remote appe... | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Motions in Limine Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
July 17, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 18CV-02641 Darryl Ray Roberts v. Jack William, et al. Motions in Limine Plaintiffs Motion In Limine No. 1: Exclude Evidence of Plaintiffs Termination From E-Place Solutions, Inc. Plaintiffs motion ... | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion in Limine | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Joint |
|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | LODGED Order/Judgment | |
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Brief | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
July 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | MSC Worksheet (Confidential) | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Meet and Confer Order | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Mandatory Settlement Conference |
|
July 10, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | 18CV-02641 Darryl Ray Roberts v. Jack William, et al. Mandatory Settlement Conference Appearance required. Remote appearances are encouraged. The parties are ordered to contact the clerk of the court ... | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement | |
June 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement | |
June 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Bacciarini, Mark |
|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
March 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
210719_Pltfs CMC Statement (1) Case Management Conference Statement |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Motion for Summary Judgment Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Request Dismissal | |
June 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
April 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
40840NoticeCo00fdfea Notice |
|
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial: Long Cause
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order
Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
210208_Pltf's Notice of Ruling Notice |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Motion for Summary Judgment Judge: Proietti, Donald |
|
February 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Letter | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply Declaration |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Response | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate Statement | |
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: Minute Order Mandatory Settlement Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | LODGED Order/Judgment | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Separate Statement | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Opposition |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
210122_Decl of Joseph Farzam Declaration |
|
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration Response |
|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Documents Not Listed Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Documents Not Listed Proof of Service |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Documents Not Listed Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Other Documents Not Listed Document: Other |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment or Summary Adjudication Notice |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Proof of Service | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | LODGED Order/Judgment | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Separate Statement | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Memorandum:Points and Authorities Memorandum: Points and Authorities |
|
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: LaPorte, James |
|
November 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: Foster, David |
|
July 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order
Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
June 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
May 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Summons | |
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
February 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
January 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney | |
January 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
December 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Non-Criminal: CMC Findings and Order Case Management Conference Judge: McCabe, Brian |
|
December 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Answer | |
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Summons | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Inclusion of CMC | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons - Filed |