Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. VS DAVID J GOMEZ
On October 04, 2018 a collections case - seller plaintiff (limited jurisdiction) case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. Judge Tricia J. Taylor presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 04, 2018
Last Refreshed
October 20, 2023
Filing Location
Los Angeles County, CA
Filing Court House
Chatsworth
Category
Collections Case - Seller Plaintiff (Limited Jurisdiction)
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Voluntary Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2022 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | On the Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. on , entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. as to the entire action |
|
July 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff) |
|
July 14, 2022 | Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal | ||
March 30, 2022 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
March 30, 2022 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry of Default and Default Judgment scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Notice of Settlement: As To Parties: removed | |
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement); Filed by: Clerk |
|
March 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); OSC re: Dismissal Date: ; Vacate Future Dates: Yes |
|
March 30, 2022 | Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Order to Show Cause re: Dismissal (Settlement) | ||
March 30, 2022 | Notice of Settlement - Notice of Settlement | ||
March 02, 2022 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry of Default and Default Judgment scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated -- Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry...): Status Date changed from to ; Name Extension changed from (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry...) to (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry...); As To Parties: removed | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry...) | |
March 02, 2022 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry of Default and Default Judgment scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
March 02, 2022 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry...) | ||
February 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice OF HEARING; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
February 14, 2022 | Notice (name extension) - Notice OF HEARING | ||
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
December 29, 2021 | Declaration re: Due Diligence - Declaration re: Due Diligence | ||
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk |
|
December 14, 2021 | Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment | ||
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ; Default not entered as to DAVID J GOMEZ; On the Complaint filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. on |
|
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
December 13, 2021 | Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment | ||
November 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | |
November 30, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 updated: Result Date to ; Result Type to Held | |
November 30, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Obtain Entry of Default and Default Judgment scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
November 30, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | ||
November 30, 2021 | hearing |
Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 |
|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID J GOMEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: ; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
November 19, 2021 | Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service | ||
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: David J GOMEZ (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/27/2021; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
October 25, 2021 | Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing | ||
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: David J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
October 05, 2021 | hearing | Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 05, 2021 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Pursuant to the request of plaintiff, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/04/2021 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 11/30/2021 08:30 AM | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/30/2021 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | |
October 04, 2021 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | ||
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | |
October 04, 2021 | hearing |
Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311 Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
August 25, 2021 | Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing | ||
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: David J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
October 06, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | |
October 06, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/06/2020 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/04/2021 08:30 AM
Judge: Graciela L. Freixes |
|
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/04/2021 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43
Judge: Graciela L. Freixes |
|
October 06, 2020 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | ||
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of Hearing; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
September 04, 2020 | Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Hearing | ||
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice Notice of Hearing; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: David J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | |
February 10, 2020 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
February 10, 2020 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
February 10, 2020 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | ||
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/10/2020 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 10/06/2020 08:30 AM | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/06/2020 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
January 21, 2020 | Notice (name extension) - Notice of Hearing | ||
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: David J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
October 10, 2019 | hearing | On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 08:30 AM | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | |
October 10, 2019 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
October 10, 2019 | Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | ||
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | On the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/10/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 02/10/2020 08:30 AM | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 02/10/2020 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
October 10, 2018 | hearing | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/10/2019 in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: DAVID J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Hon. Rick Brown in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff) |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740) | |
October 04, 2018 | Civil Case Cover Sheet | ||
October 04, 2018 | Summons - on Complaint | ||
October 04, 2018 | Complaint | ||
October 04, 2018 | Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) |
|
|
October 04, 2018 | Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case | ||
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | The case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740) | |
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Complaint; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff); As to: David J GOMEZ (Defendant) |
|
October 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Plaintiff) |
|