Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Dbd Homes, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Logan David Gilbert, Ramon Scott Perry, against Any And All Occupants, Jackson, Carl, in the jurisdiction of Allen County. This case was filed in Allen County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 18, 2023 |
CategoryEv - Evictions (Small Claims Docket) |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationAllen County, IN |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Order for Writ
Date: August 22, 2023Writ for Property Issued
Date: August 22, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ Returned Served Possession restored 08/24/2023 |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Writ | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Writ for Property Issued Writ of Restitution, Order for Writ, and copy of judgment for possession issued to the Sheriff. |
|
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Request for Writ | |
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated ENotice Issued to Parties Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 8/10/2023 : Ramon Scott Perry;Ramon S Perry;Logan David Gilbert |
|
August 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Automated Paper Notice Issued to Parties Final Partial Judgment entered ---- 8/10/2023 : Carl Jackson |
|
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Partial Judgment entered | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Default Judgment Filed for Possession |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Status Conference | |
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Returned Served (E-Filing) Notice of Claim served 7/18/2023. Copy posted and mailed to residence. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.