We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

N Adams Comm Schools Trustees

Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago

North Adams Community Schools, filed a(n) Mi - Miscellaneous Civil case represented by Scott Bradley Ainsworth, in the jurisdiction of Adams County. This case was filed in Adams County Superior Courts .

Case Details for North Adams Community Schools v.

Filing Date

April 20, 2009

Category

Mi - Miscellaneous Civil

Last Refreshed

March 11, 2024

Filing Location

Adams County, IN

Parties for North Adams Community Schools v.

Plaintiffs

North Adams Community Schools

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Scott Bradley Ainsworth

Case Events for North Adams Community Schools v.

Type Description
Docket Event Converted Event
ALL FILINGS AS OF 1/2/2018 WILL BE SCANNED AND VIEWABLE AS DIGITAL IMAGES. NO MORE PAPER FILINGS WILL BE KEPT IN THIS FILE. (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 12/29/2017
Docket Event Converted Event
Court's Order entered (RJO) (Attorney Ainsworth picked up copies in Court's Office) vh 4/22/09: Order filed. mja (DISPOSED: BD ) (RJO? Y) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/21/2009
Docket Event Converted Event
Appearance and Petition to Appoint filed by Scott A. Ainsworth atty for petitioner. Issued filed stamped copies back to counsel. mja (RJO? N) | JTS Minute Entry Date: 04/20/2009
See all events