Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Song, Ingeun, filed a(n) General Securities - Securities case represented by Rosen, Laurence M, against Arias, Diana, Cao, Yi, China International Capital Corporation Hong Kong Securities Limited, Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse Securities, (total of 19) See All represented by Blake, Stephen P., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Foiles, Robert D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFoiles, Robert D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management121 days |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2018 |
Category(28) Complex Unlimited Securities Litigation |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaSecurities |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Securities |
|
Declaration
Date: May 16, 2018Request for Judicial Notice
Date: May 16, 2018Order
Date: May 17, 2018Order
Date: May 22, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: June 11, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: June 22, 2018Motion to Stay
Date: September 14, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 28, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 28, 2018Complaint
Date: March 21, 2018Order
Date: May 11, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: June 08, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: June 06, 2018Order
Date: May 25, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: June 08, 2018Declaration
Date: May 15, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: May 15, 2018Order
Date: June 19, 2018Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: July 18, 2018Order
Date: March 16, 2020Stipulation & Order
Date: June 11, 2020Order Staying Case
Date: December 21, 2018Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: July 18, 2018Joinder
Date: July 24, 2018Order
Date: February 05, 2021Stipulation & Order
Date: May 11, 2021Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Date: June 26, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: May 22, 2018Order
Date: July 24, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: September 06, 2018Order
Date: July 16, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: May 23, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: December 26, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: June 22, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: January 04, 2019Declaration
Date: May 16, 2018Motion
Date: May 16, 2018Order
Date: July 24, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: September 28, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: October 18, 2019Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice (RENEWAL)
Date: March 13, 2020Ex Parte Application
Date: May 22, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2021 | Tentative Ruling |
Judge: HONORABLE ROBERT D FOILES, Department 21 14:00 INGEUN SONG VS. QUDIAN, INC., ET.AL. INGEUN SONG LAURENCE M. ROSEN QUDIAN, INC. STEPHEN P. BLAKE COMPLEX CASE STATUS CONFERENCE TENTATIVE RULING: ...
Judge: HONORABLE ROBERT D FOILES |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case ordered off calendar Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal filed 07/26/21. |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Complex Case Status Conference 09/10/2021 Complex Case Status Conference Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Matter is called at: 2:01 pm. |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | No appearance by any parties or their counsel of record. | |
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order Type: STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH ORDER ATTACHEDSigned by: JUDGE FO Stipulation & Order Type: STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH ORDER ATTACHED Signed by: JUDGE FOILES Date Signed: 7/23/21 |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF LAURENCE ROSEN IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSA Declaration in Support DECLARATION OF LAURENCE ROSEN IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, ETC... served on SEE ATTACHED S Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, ETC... served on SEE ATTACHED SERVICE LIST |
|
May 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Conference
Judge: Buchwald, Gerald J. |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Complex Case Status Conference
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.