Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
524 Union Street, A California General Partnership, Smucha, Beverly A., Knopf, James S., filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Akay, Douglas N., against Does 1 Through 10, Does 3 Through 10, Knopf, James S., represented by Halloran, Timothy J., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Weiner, Marie S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWeiner, Marie S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management202 days |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2018 |
Category(25) Unlimited Professional Negligence |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 31, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: August 31, 2018Motion to Stay
Date: October 01, 2018Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 03, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: October 21, 2021Cross Complaint
Date: October 21, 2021BERRY DECL ISO MTC_PO_EXHS_EXE
Date: April 23, 20222022-04-22 Notice and Motion to Compel_POS
Date: April 23, 2022MTC&PO_MPA_DNA_EXE
Date: April 23, 2022Stipulation Re Cont Hearing for MTCompel
Date: June 10, 2022Notice of Court Hearing
Date: May 22, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: August 20, 2018Answer
Date: December 08, 2021Notice
Date: October 30, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 01, 2018Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: August 01, 2018Motion
Date: August 31, 2018Summons Issued / Filed
Date: February 01, 2018Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: February 01, 2018Proof of Service by MAIL of
Date: October 05, 2021Substitution of Attorney as to
Date: August 01, 2018Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of
Date: December 08, 2021Proof of Service by PERSONAL SERVICE of
Date: September 27, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: April 22, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: April 22, 2022Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: April 22, 2022Notice of Change of Address of Attorney
Date: October 05, 2021Notice of Court Hearing
Date: July 03, 2018Stipulation & Order
Date: June 14, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: August 31, 2018MPA ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel
Date: August 11, 2022Decl Tyra Mendez ISO Opp to MTC
Date: August 11, 2022Decl of James Knopf ISO Opp to MTC
Date: August 11, 2022Dec Adrian ISO Opp MTC
Date: August 11, 2022Decl Jeff Co IT ISO Opp to MTC
Date: August 11, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 11, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 11, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 11, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 11, 2022Declaration in Opposition
Date: August 11, 2022REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
Date: December 03, 20222022-12-06 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL
Date: December 06, 2022524 Union Street
Date: December 07, 2022Request for Dismissal_POS_EXE
Date: December 08, 2022Complaint
Date: February 01, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal_POS_EXE | |
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event | 524 Union Street | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | 2022-12-06 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
December 03, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel COMPLIANCE WITH THE MARCH 28, 2022 AGREEMENT TO PRODUCE NATIVE FORMAT AND THE January 11, 2022 AGREEMENT TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS AND FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | MPA ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Decl Tyra Mendez ISO Opp to MTC | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Decl of James Knopf ISO Opp to MTC | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Dec Adrian ISO Opp MTC | |
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event | Decl Jeff Co IT ISO Opp to MTC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.