Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Mercury Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Splinter Robert George, Thai Min Nhu, against Gomez Michel, Gomez Oscar, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts Stanley Mosk with Michael J. Convey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael J. Convey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 04, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseStanley Mosk |
This complaint is a summons in a legal case. The plaintiff, Mercury Insurance Company, is suing defendants Michel Gomez, Oscar Gomez, and Does 1 through 50. The notice informs the defendants that they have been sued and that the court may decide agai...
Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Complaint; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Michel Gomez (Defendant)
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Michel Gomez (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00; On the Complaint filed by Mercury Insurance Company on
Date: 2018-09-07T00:00:00Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-08-13T00:00:00; Default not entered as to Michel Gomez; On the Complaint filed by Mercury Insurance Company on
Date: 2018-08-07T00:00:00Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-12T00:00:00Affidavit of Reasonable Diligence; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-09-08T00:00:00Default entered as to Michel Gomez; On the Complaint filed by Mercury Insurance Company on
Date: 2018-08-21T00:00:00Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Notice of Ruling; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-07-26T00:00:00Motion for Terminating Sanctions; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-06-12T00:00:00Answer; Filed by: Michel Gomez (Defendant)
Date: 2017-11-27T00:00:00Default entered as to Oscar Gomez; On the Complaint filed by Mercury Insurance Company on
Date: 2017-10-27T00:00:00Declaration CCP 585(d); Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-08-04T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Mercury Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-50
Date: 2018-09-21T00:00:00Proof of Service by Substituted Service
Date: September 15, 2017Motion re: (name extension)
Date: March 07, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Order; Hearing on Motion to Compel resp...)
Date: April 18, 2018Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: June 12, 2018Order (name extension) - on Motion for Terminating Sanctions to Strike Answer
Date: July 24, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Terminating Sanctions)
Date: July 24, 2018Complaint
Date: August 04, 2017Summons - on Complaint
Date: August 04, 2017Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case
Date: August 04, 2017Affidavit (name extension) - of Reasonable Diligence
Date: September 08, 2017Affidavit (name extension) - of Reasonable Diligence
Date: September 12, 2017Answer
Date: November 27, 2017Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: October 27, 2017Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: November 27, 2017Notice (name extension) - of Ruling
Date: July 26, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 07, 2018Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment
Date: August 13, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: August 21, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: September 07, 2018Minute Order - (Order to Show Cause re: Status of Default Judgment Packet)
Date: September 11, 2018Judgment
Date: September 21, 2018Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment
Date: September 21, 2018Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)
Date: September 21, 2018Request for Dismissal
Date: September 21, 2018Declaration (name extension) - CCP 585(d)
Date: September 21, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.