Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 10, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed by the plaintiff, Pacific Bell Telephone Company, against the defendants Marcos Ponce, Anna Babayanis, and Serge Babikian. The complaint alleges causes of action for personal injury, property damage, and wrong...
(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: April 25, 2017Motion for Order (name extension)
Date: June 22, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 07, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion - Other to Deem Requests for Admissions Adm...)
Date: September 13, 2018Complaint - Other Personal Injury
Date: April 10, 2017Summons
Date: April 10, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: April 10, 2017(name extension) - AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE DILIGENCE FILED
Date: April 25, 2017Affidavit (name extension) - of Reasonable Diligence
Date: April 25, 2017Response (name extension) - ANSWER
Date: May 16, 2017(name extension) - REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED
Date: June 21, 2017(name extension) - REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED
Date: June 21, 2017Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: June 21, 2017Other - (name extension)
Date: June 22, 2018Order (name extension)
Date: September 13, 2018Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing
Date: September 26, 2018Stipulation (name extension) - No Order - to Continue Trial
Date: October 03, 2018Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment
Date: February 26, 2019Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal
Date: February 26, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: March 11, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.