Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Macksound & Macksound Llp, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Macksoud Alexander E, against Mouingo Karolina, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with James E. Blancarte presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 02, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-26T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by:
Date: 2017-03-02T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum and Statement of Location; Filed by:
Date: 2017-03-30T00:00:00Clerk's Notice of Voiding of Filing; Filed by:
Date: 2017-05-15T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-15T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: MACKSOUND & MACKSOUND LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-06-20T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-21T00:00:00Substitution of Attorney; Filed by: MACKSOUND & MACKSOUND LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-09-23T00:00:00Declaration declaration of Cameron Astiazaran; Filed by: MACKSOUND & MACKSOUND LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2019-08-27T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court); Filed by:
Date: 2017-05-02T00:00:00Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-10-01T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-09-04T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-04-06T00:00:00Notice of Settlement of Entire Case; Filed by: MACKSOUND & MACKSOUND LLP (Plaintiff)
Date: 2018-08-31T00:00:00Default Reject; Filed by:
Date: 2017-06-06T00:00:00Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 21, 2019Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: November 21, 2019Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service
Date: August 27, 2019(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: March 16, 2017Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: August 31, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 13, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: July 11, 2019Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: August 15, 2019Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: February 04, 2019Motion to Enforce Settlement - Motion to Enforce Settlement
Date: July 11, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOT...)
Date: November 21, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion for Leave to Amend NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOT...)
Date: September 24, 2019Complaint - Breach of Contract
Date: March 02, 2017Summons
Date: March 02, 2017Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: March 02, 2017Response (name extension) - ANSWER * * VACATED
Date: March 30, 2017Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)
Date: April 06, 2017Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing (Superior Court)
Date: May 02, 2017Other - (name extension)
Date: May 15, 2017Response (name extension) - ANSWER
Date: May 19, 2017Other - (name extension)
Date: June 06, 2017Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing
Date: June 15, 2018Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing
Date: June 21, 2018Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing
Date: June 26, 2018Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/04/2018
Date: September 04, 2018Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)
Date: September 04, 2018Notice of Rejection - Fax Filing
Date: October 01, 2018Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))
Date: February 14, 2019Notice (name extension) - Notice notice of continuance of osc
Date: February 21, 2019Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: June 20, 2019Declaration (name extension) - Declaration declaration of Cameron Astiazaran
Date: August 27, 2019Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement); Order to Show...)
Date: September 11, 2019Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney
Date: September 23, 2019Judgment - Judgment
Date: November 21, 2019For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.