Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Judit Van Caenegem, Sweetsuite, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Dennis B.K. Fong, Dpjw Group Ii Lp, Dpjw Group, Lp, Dpjw Management, Llc, represented by Thomas Ailbe Rector, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Maureen A. Folan presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaureen A. Folan Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 29, 2017 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited(06) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Judit Van Caenegem and SweetSuite, LLC dba Dollars Market against defendants Dennis B.K. Fong, DPJW Group II, LP, DPJW Management, LLC, and Does 1 through 10. The complaint alleges breach of contract and ne...
Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: April 17, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: January 09, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: January 09, 2020Order
Date: April 17, 2019Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: June 04, 2019Application and Order: Ex Parte
Date: February 26, 2018Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: April 17, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: April 17, 2019Minute Order
Date: November 15, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: December 29, 2017Minute Order
Date: April 09, 2019Minute Order
Date: August 15, 2018Complaint: Amended
Date: April 13, 2018Minute Order
Date: April 17, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: October 13, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: January 09, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 05, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 02, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 18, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: December 03, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: August 14, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 26, 2020Minute Order
Date: July 23, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: April 09, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: April 17, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: November 13, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 06, 2020Motion: Compel
Date: August 06, 2020Conference: Further Case Management
Date: July 23, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 29, 2020Minute Order
Date: December 03, 2019Motion: Compel
Date: May 26, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2020 | Hearing |
Conference: Further Case Management
Judge: Department 6 |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
August 06, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Compel
Judge: Department 6 |
|
August 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order After Hearing - POS GRANTED-hrg: 08/06/20; 9AM; D6-- re: Motion to Compel Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
May 26, 2020 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
May 26, 2020 | Hearing |
Motion: Compel
Judge: Department 6 |
|
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Memorandum: Points and Authorities | |
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion: Compel HRG 05/26/2020 9am D6 Atty: Reed Judge: Maureen A. Folan |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Declaration: In Support |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.