Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Julie T. Nguyen, filed a(n) Writ Of Mandate Unlimited (02) case against Little Orchard Business Park Owners Association, Peter Weber, represented by Peter Lee Weber, in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Santa Clara with Helen E. Williams presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 23, 2017 |
CategoryWrit Of Mandate Unlimited (02) |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSanta Clara |
Minute Order
Date: January 30, 2019Hearing: Petition Writ of Mandate
Date: August 09, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: March 19, 2019Hearing: Petition Writ of Mandate
Date: January 30, 2019Memorandum of Costs
Date: March 19, 2019Motion: Other
Date: March 19, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: July 08, 2019Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: July 06, 2018Stipulation and Order
Date: April 09, 2019Stipulation and Order
Date: May 28, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: October 18, 2018Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: October 18, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 09, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: October 18, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: July 25, 2018Response/Reply
Date: July 25, 2018Response/Reply
Date: August 03, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: July 25, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: July 25, 2018Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: October 23, 2017Brief: Trial
Date: January 24, 2019Order: Proposed
Date: March 19, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: March 19, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: July 08, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: March 04, 2019Notice: Entry of Order
Date: October 23, 2018Declaration: In Support
Date: March 19, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 19, 2019Response/Reply
Date: July 12, 2019Hearing: Motion hearings
Date: July 19, 2019Order: Submitted Matter
Date: October 17, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: July 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order: Submitted Matter For Hrg 7-19-19, Mtn for Attys' Fees and Costs is Denied. |
|
July 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
July 19, 2019 | Hearing | Hearing: Motion hearings | |
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Response/Reply Respondent's Reply Brief to Motion for Attorney's Fees and Costs |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum: Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points & Authorities |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition/Objections To Motion for Attorney fees |
|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration | |
June 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Substitution: Attorney Old Atty: La Force / New Atty: Weber |
|
May 28, 2019 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Cont hrg from 6-21-19 to 7-19-19 by Judge Williams |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice RE: Change of Handling Attorney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.