Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Bradley D. Doucette filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts Superior with Socrates P. Manoukian presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSocrates P. Manoukian Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 25, 2009 |
CategoryOther Real Property Unlimited (26) |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Clara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a cross-complaint filed by WEC and Associates, Inc. against California Home Builders & Design, Inc. and other parties. WEC alleges that California Homes and other cross-defendants were negligent in carrying out their duties, and the...
Minute Order
Date: February 10, 2021Order: Ex Parte
Date: November 01, 2022Conference: Case Management
Date: September 05, 2017Conference: Further Case Management
Date: February 06, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: May 29, 2018Conference: Further Case Management
Date: August 28, 2018Review: Mediation Status
Date: January 10, 2019Conference: Further Case Management
Date: April 23, 2019Review: Mediation Status
Date: August 01, 2019Conference: Trial Setting
Date: November 19, 2019Motion: Continue
Date: July 14, 2020Conference: Trial Setting
Date: September 15, 2020Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication
Date: February 02, 2021Conference: Trial Setting
Date: February 02, 2021Conference: Trial Setting
Date: August 03, 2021Conference: Trial Setting
Date: February 08, 2022Conference: Settlement Jury
Date: October 26, 2022Substitution: Attorney
Date: December 06, 2021Opposition/Objections
Date: November 03, 2022Notice
Date: April 27, 2021Request
Date: September 02, 2022Request: Dismissal
Date: January 24, 2023Declaration: In Support
Date: October 28, 2022Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: October 18, 2021Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: November 01, 2022Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: October 27, 2022Substitution: Attorney
Date: December 29, 2021Stipulation
Date: October 27, 2022Minute Order
Date: August 03, 2021Minute Order
Date: November 08, 2022Declaration: In Support
Date: October 28, 2022Request: Dismissal
Date: January 24, 2023Minute Order
Date: February 08, 2022Order: Submitted Matter
Date: March 19, 2021Motion: Good Faith Settlement
Date: October 28, 2022Returned/Undeliverable Mail
Date: November 17, 2022Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: January 19, 2021Response/Reply
Date: January 28, 2021Separate Statement
Date: January 19, 2021Minute Order
Date: February 04, 2021Request: Judicial Notice
Date: January 19, 2021Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore
Date: February 02, 2021Opposition/Objections
Date: January 28, 2021Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: February 02, 2021Response/Reply
Date: January 28, 2021Motion: Continuance (Trial)
Date: March 04, 2020Ex Parte Application - Notice Required
Date: February 26, 2020Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: June 12, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 15, 2018Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: June 29, 2018Cross-Complaint
Date: May 25, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 24, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 16, 2019Minute Order
Date: February 06, 2018Order: Ex Parte
Date: February 26, 2020Minute Order
Date: January 10, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 13, 2018Minute Order
Date: August 29, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 02, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 29, 2018Cross-Complaint
Date: May 01, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 20, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 06, 2017Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: January 23, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 26, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 14, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 11, 2019Minute Order
Date: April 23, 2019Answer: Cross Complaint
Date: June 29, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 15, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: May 14, 2018Minute Order
Date: May 30, 2018Notice: Entry of Order
Date: February 27, 2020Motion: Summary Judgment
Date: November 17, 2020Separate Statement
Date: November 17, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: November 17, 2020Order: Proposed
Date: November 17, 2020Request: Judicial Notice
Date: November 17, 2020Declaration
Date: January 19, 2021Evidence
Date: November 17, 2020Declaration
Date: January 19, 2021Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: May 01, 2018Proof of Service: Mail
Date: June 12, 2018Notice
Date: May 25, 2018Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
Date: November 26, 2019Notice: Association/Co-Counsel
Date: May 25, 2018Demand: Jury Trial
Date: May 25, 2018Proof of Service
Date: May 15, 2018Declaration
Date: May 25, 2018Declaration
Date: January 19, 2021Declaration
Date: February 26, 2020Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: May 25, 2018Evidence
Date: December 16, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: November 17, 2020Minute Order
Date: September 29, 2020Declaration: In Support
Date: November 17, 2020Motion: Continuance (Trial)
Date: March 06, 2020Order: Proposed
Date: October 27, 2022Hearing: Dismissal after settlement
Date: January 26, 2023Motion: Approve Good Faith Settlement
Date: November 08, 2022Motion: Continuance (Trial)
Date: March 04, 2020Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: December 27, 2018Order: Proposed
Date: September 18, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: February 14, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: September 02, 2020Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 14, 2022Stipulation and Order
Date: November 06, 2018Declaration: Non-Service
Date: November 07, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: February 14, 2022Supplemental
Date: September 18, 2018Memorandum: Points and Authorities
Date: August 16, 2018Opposition/Objections
Date: September 05, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 19, 2019Minute Order
Date: September 30, 2020Declaration
Date: February 18, 2022Response/Reply
Date: February 14, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 18, 2022Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: August 13, 2018Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Date: April 07, 2023Conference: Trial Setting
Date: September 22, 2020Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: February 23, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 07, 2018OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: May 02, 2019Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Proof of Service: Personal
Date: November 16, 2018Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: February 24, 2023Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 14, 2022Minute Order
Date: April 18, 2023Motion: Sanctions
Date: February 18, 2022Proof of Service
Date: February 18, 2022Notice: Change Address/Firm Name
Date: March 20, 2023Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: April 03, 2023Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K
Date: February 24, 2023Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
Date: April 04, 2023Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee
Date: November 04, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 11, 2022Review: Mediation Status
Date: September 19, 2019Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
Date: June 17, 2022Notice
Date: June 17, 2022Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: February 14, 2022Conference: Case Management
Date: April 18, 2023Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: March 17, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 17, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 22, 2022Declaration
Date: February 18, 2022Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: February 18, 2022Notice: Remote Appearance
Date: April 13, 2023Order
Date: March 21, 2022Proof of Service
Date: March 09, 2022Proof of Service
Date: March 14, 2022Brief
Date: March 09, 2022Proof of Service
Date: April 20, 2022Exhibit List (Party)
Date: March 09, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: March 14, 2022Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: March 17, 2022Motion: Sanctions
Date: February 18, 2022Clerk Rejection Letter
Date: March 17, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 03, 2023Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: November 14, 2022Minute Order
Date: March 19, 2019Opposition/Objections
Date: March 11, 2022Minute Order
Date: February 26, 2020Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: October 05, 2022OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve
Date: August 03, 2023LT Clerk Default Pending
Date: May 09, 2023Proof of Service
Date: September 18, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: August 13, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: November 14, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 06, 2022Declaration
Date: November 04, 2019Proof of Service
Date: September 18, 2018Order
Date: March 26, 2019Proof of Service: Electronic
Date: August 16, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 10, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 11, 2022Request: Dismissal
Date: April 22, 2019Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: August 13, 2018Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K
Date: October 05, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: November 21, 2022Order
Date: March 13, 2019Request
Date: November 16, 2018Statement: Settlement Conference
Date: March 09, 2022Request: Dismissal
Date: April 20, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: February 24, 2023Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)
Date: November 14, 2022Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: November 04, 2022Minute Order
Date: November 27, 2018Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
Date: December 27, 2018Default Entered
Date: February 22, 2022Minute Order
Date: May 02, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 11, 2023Summons: Issued/Filed
Date: February 24, 2023Supplemental
Date: September 18, 2018Proof of Service
Date: March 11, 2022Notice
Date: February 24, 2022Minute Order
Date: October 11, 2019Minute Order
Date: November 14, 2019Minute Order
Date: July 26, 2022Order
Date: October 10, 2019Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)
Date: December 19, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: April 24, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 14, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 06, 2022Order: Submitted Matter
Date: December 10, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: October 29, 2019Conference: Trial Setting
Date: February 11, 2020Proof of Service: Mail
Date: September 18, 2018Minute Order
Date: June 11, 2019Minute Order
Date: November 26, 2018Conference: Case Management
Date: November 27, 2018Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 16, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 17, 2022Proof of Service: Mail
Date: February 17, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: July 15, 2022Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)
Date: March 25, 2022Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: February 15, 2022Request: Dismissal
Date: March 05, 2021Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear
Date: November 14, 2019Declaration: In Support
Date: September 05, 2018Request: Dismissal
Date: February 14, 2022Proof of Service: Personal
Date: September 12, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 29, 2022Proof of Service: Mail
Date: August 16, 2018Minute Order
Date: September 25, 2018Minute Order
Date: March 01, 2022Minute Order
Date: July 29, 2020Minute Order
Date: August 01, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: December 21, 2018Minute Order
Date: November 26, 2019Statement: Case Management Conference
Date: August 16, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 03, 2023 | Hearing | OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
LT Clerk Default Pending BASIC |
|
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service: Mail | |
May 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice: Termination of Temporary Judge | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Minute Order | |
April 18, 2023 | Hearing | Conference: Case Management | |
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice: Remote Appearance Defendants' Notice of Remote Appearance |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Statement: Case Management Conference Case Management Statement (Statements) |
|
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) Proof of Service of Summons |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable) $150 Jury fees deposited by DEF Atty: Parker |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.