Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Kaye, David B., Medical Doctor, Kaye, M.D., David B., filed a(n) 08 Unlimited - Civil Rights case represented by Ryan, Russell K., against Fresno Surgery Center, A California Limited Partnership, Fresno Surgery Center, Lp, Fsc Hospital, Llc, Fsc Hospital, Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, represented by Ammann, Elizabeth D., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with McGuire, Rosemary presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management117 days |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2017 |
Category08 Unlimited - Civil Rights |
Time To Trial1153 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2024 |
||
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
||
Notice of Hearing
Date: March 26, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 04, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: March 26, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: March 26, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 06, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 02, 2018Civil Complaint filed
Date: December 06, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 06, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: July 19, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: July 19, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 06, 2018Reply filed
Date: September 11, 2018Answer Filed
Date: November 06, 2018Reply filed
Date: September 11, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 13, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 09, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 01, 2019Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 12, 2019Order Denied
Date: July 01, 2020Order Denied
Date: March 10, 2020Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 25, 2019Notice Filed
Date: December 17, 2018ADR Stipulation - Not All Signed
Date: February 15, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 13, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 10, 2018Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: February 02, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: February 25, 2021Order Granted
Date: March 09, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: March 18, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 16, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: May 17, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: May 18, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: June 30, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: June 29, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: November 09, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: October 28, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: September 01, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: November 10, 2021Proof of Service
Date: December 20, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: March 26, 2018Summons issued and filed
Date: December 11, 2017Notice Filed
Date: December 11, 2017Notice Filed
Date: April 26, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: April 17, 2019Answer Filed
Date: April 24, 2019Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: February 18, 2020Civil case cover sheet
Date: December 06, 2017Proof of Service
Date: December 19, 2017Proof of Service
Date: December 20, 2017Amended Document Filed
Date: October 09, 2018Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: September 21, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: October 22, 2020Deposit, payment,disbursment
Date: April 02, 2018Notice Filed
Date: September 03, 2020Notice Filed
Date: February 19, 2020Motion filed
Date: July 19, 2018Amended Document Filed
Date: April 19, 2018Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: October 27, 2020Notice Filed
Date: July 18, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: November 13, 2018Answer Filed
Date: November 13, 2018Case Management Statement Filed
Date: February 26, 2019Notice Filed
Date: September 06, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: November 13, 2018Notice Filed
Date: February 28, 2019Notice Filed
Date: March 05, 2019Order Denied
Date: February 16, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: October 22, 2020Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: March 08, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: January 02, 2019Notice Filed
Date: March 14, 2019Proof of Service
Date: March 19, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: March 19, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: March 19, 2020Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: April 07, 2020Notice of Hearing
Date: July 02, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: September 01, 2020Notice Filed
Date: January 11, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: February 08, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: March 18, 2021Order filed
Date: April 16, 2021Statement filed
Date: February 14, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Order Received for Signature
Date: December 09, 2021Notice Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 09, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: February 14, 2022Stipulation and Order to Continue Trial filed
Date: December 13, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Statement filed
Date: April 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Request for Judicial Notice
Date: April 22, 2022Reply filed
Date: April 26, 2022Opposition filed
Date: April 22, 2022Notice Filed
Date: May 21, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 06, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 19, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: September 06, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 21, 2022Fax Received
Date: July 22, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: August 12, 2022Answer Filed
Date: July 19, 2018Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: June 30, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: July 09, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: July 07, 2020Notice Filed
Date: April 16, 2020Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: June 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2024 | Tentative Ruling | Re: Kaye v. Fresno Surgery Center Superior Court Case No. 17CECG04183 Hearing Date: February 8, 2024 (Dept. 403) Motion: Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Testimony from Person Most Knowledgeable of Defend... | |
December 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Jury both; 7 to 10 days Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Trial Readiness
Judge: Gaab, Kimberly |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference | |
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
10-4-22 Joint Declaration Declaration Filed Joint Declaration |
|
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
10-4-22 Stipulation and Order Received Order Received for Signature Forwarded to Dept: 502 Order for: Stipulation Continue Trial |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
9-12-22 Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address Notice Filed Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
8-23-22 Order Denied on Request for Pretrial Discovery Conference Order Denied on request for pretrial discovery conference Judge: McGuire, Rosemary |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Appeared in Person DATY: Tuyet Tran on behalf of Elizabeth Ammann |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.