We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Pingora Loan Servicing Llc Vs Nonrecord Claimants Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

Pingora Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) case represented by Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Tinker Linda, Unknown Owners, Nonrecord Claimants, Tinker Marcus, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .

Case Details for Pingora Loan Servicing Llc v. Tinker Linda , et al.

Filing Date

February 25, 2016

Last Refreshed

February 21, 2021

Filing Location

Cook County, IL

Parties for Pingora Loan Servicing Llc v. Tinker Linda , et al.

Plaintiffs

Pingora Loan Servicing Llc

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Codilis Ernest J Jr

Defendants

Tinker Linda

Unknown Owners

Nonrecord Claimants

Tinker Marcus

Case Documents for Pingora Loan Servicing Llc v. Tinker Linda , et al.

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: June 03, 2016

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: May 26, 2016

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00

LETTER RETURNED FILED

Date: June 29, 2016

DEFAULT - ALLOWED -

Date: June 10, 2016

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-05-26T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: June 03, 2016

NOTICE FILED

Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT FILED

Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00

***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)

Date: 2016-05-23T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE

Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00

VERIFIED STATEMENT OF FILING FEE

Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED

Date: 2016-03-02T00:00:00

CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL

Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00

Case Events for Pingora Loan Servicing Llc v. Tinker Linda , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, NON-SUIT OR DISMISSED BY AGREEMENT

Judge: MULLEN, MICHAEL TULLY

Docket Event STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - ALLOWED -

Judge: MULLEN, MICHAEL TULLY

Docket Event LETTER RETURNED FILED
Docket Event NOTICE OF DEFAULT ORDER MAILED - FEE PAID
Docket Event DEFAULT - ALLOWED -

Judge: MULLEN, MICHAEL TULLY

Docket Event JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ENTERED (CASE IS PENDING)

Judge: MULLEN, MICHAEL TULLY

Docket Event DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - ALLOWED -

Judge: MULLEN, MICHAEL TULLY

Docket Event NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Docket Event MOTION FILED
Docket Event CERTIFICATE FILED
See all events