We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Pnc Bank N A Vs Bolker Molly A Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

Pnc Bank N A, filed a(n) case represented by Codilis Ernest J Jr, against Unknown Owners, Non Record Claimants, Bolker Ronald L, Bolker Molly A, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .

Case Details for Pnc Bank N A v. Unknown Owners , et al.

Filing Date

February 16, 2016

Last Refreshed

February 21, 2021

Filing Location

Cook County, IL

Parties for Pnc Bank N A v. Unknown Owners , et al.

Plaintiffs

Pnc Bank N A

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Codilis Ernest J Jr

Defendants

Unknown Owners

Non Record Claimants

Bolker Ronald L

Bolker Molly A

Attorneys for Defendants

Pro Se

Case Documents for Pnc Bank N A v. Unknown Owners , et al.

ANSWER FILED

Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: October 24, 2016

***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)

Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT FILED

Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00

RECEIPT FILED

Date: October 24, 2016

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: October 27, 2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00

NOTICE FILED

Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-06-27T00:00:00

ORDER FOR POSSESSION

Date: November 16, 2016

MEMORANDUM OF JUDGEMENT ENTERED

Date: November 16, 2016

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: October 27, 2016

NOTICE FILED

Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00

NOTICE OF FILING FILED

Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00

***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)

Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00

CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -

Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2016-09-12T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

Date: 2016-04-26T00:00:00

REPORT OF SALE AND DISTRIBUTION

Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT FILED

Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT FILED

Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-06-22T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-10-24T00:00:00

APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -

Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00

SUMMARY JUDGMENT - ALLOWED -

Date: 2016-07-13T00:00:00

CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL

Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00

VERIFIED STATEMENT OF FILING FEE

Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-04-05T00:00:00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE

Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00

Case Events for Pnc Bank N A v. Unknown Owners , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE DISPOSED / SHERIFFS SALE APPROVED

Judge: SENECHALLE ROBERT E JR

Docket Event ORDER FOR POSSESSION

Judge: SENECHALLE ROBERT E JR

Docket Event MEMORANDUM OF JUDGEMENT ENTERED

Judge: SENECHALLE ROBERT E JR

Docket Event CERTIFICATE FILED
Docket Event EXHIBITS FILED
Docket Event NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Docket Event RECEIPT FILED
Docket Event ***APPROVE SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Docket Event MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Docket Event CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
See all events