We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Mtglq Investors Lp Et Al Vs Blackburn Marilyn J Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

Mtglq Investors Lp, Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) case represented by Anselmo Lindberg Oliver L, against Unknown Owners, Parker Marilyn J, Parker Douglas, Nonrecord Claimants, Blackburn Marilyn J, (total of 5) See All represented by Montiel Samuel Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .

Case Details for Mtglq Investors Lp v. Unknown Owners , et al.

Filing Date

January 07, 2016

Last Refreshed

February 21, 2021

Filing Location

Cook County, IL

Parties for Mtglq Investors Lp v. Unknown Owners , et al.

Plaintiffs

Mtglq Investors Lp

Wells Fargo Bank Na

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Anselmo Lindberg Oliver L

Defendants

Unknown Owners

Parker Marilyn J

Parker Douglas

Nonrecord Claimants

Blackburn Marilyn J

Attorneys for Defendants

Montiel Samuel Alexander

Case Documents for Mtglq Investors Lp v. Unknown Owners , et al.

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: March 07, 2017

MOTION FILED

Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT FILED

Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT FILED

Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE

Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00

MOTION TO DISMISS FILED

Date: December 05, 2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: January 26, 2017

MOTION TO - ALLOWED -

Date: February 07, 2017

NOTICE OF FILING FILED

Date: October 13, 2017

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: October 13, 2017

NOTICE OF FILING FILED

Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: March 07, 2017

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2016-05-05T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00

CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL

Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00

MISCELLANEOUS MOTION - ALLOWED -

Date: 2016-08-22T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-02-01T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: 2016-04-13T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2017-01-19T00:00:00

ANSWER FILED

Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00

APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -

Date: 2016-03-14T00:00:00

CASE ELECTRONICALLY FILED

Date: 2016-06-16T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2017-01-26T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00

VERIFIED STATEMENT OF FILING FEE

Date: 2016-01-07T00:00:00

Case Events for Mtglq Investors Lp v. Unknown Owners , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, NON-SUIT OR DISMISSED BY AGREEMENT

Judge: BRENNAN DANIEL PATRICK

Docket Event MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Docket Event NOTICE OF CHANGE OF OFFICE FILED
Docket Event NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Docket Event PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Docket Event CERTIFICATE FILED
Docket Event PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Docket Event MOTION TO - ALLOWED -

Judge: BRENNAN DANIEL PATRICK

Docket Event APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Docket Event PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
See all events