We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

True Partner Consulting L Vs Andersen Tax Llc Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

True Partner Consulting L, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Kirkland & Ellis Llp, against Andersen Tax Llc, Mcdonald Robert, represented by Goldberg Kohn Ltd, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with John C. Griffin presiding.

Case Details for True Partner Consulting L v. Andersen Tax Llc , et al.

Judge

John C. Griffin

Filing Date

February 17, 2015

Category

Contract

Last Refreshed

February 21, 2021

Practice Area

Commercial

Filing Location

Cook County, IL

Matter Type

Breach of Contract

Parties for True Partner Consulting L v. Andersen Tax Llc , et al.

Plaintiffs

True Partner Consulting L

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Kirkland & Ellis Llp

Defendants

Andersen Tax Llc

Mcdonald Robert

Attorneys for Defendants

Goldberg Kohn Ltd

Case Documents for True Partner Consulting L v. Andersen Tax Llc , et al.

MOTION FILED

Date: December 31, 2015

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: December 31, 2015

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: December 31, 2015

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

Date: December 31, 2015

MOTION FILED

Date: December 28, 2015

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

Date: December 28, 2015

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: December 28, 2015

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-12-28T00:00:00

NOTICE OF FILING FILED

Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00

ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM FILED

Date: 2015-12-18T00:00:00

STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED

Date: 2015-11-06T00:00:00

RESTRICTED IMAGE

Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00

STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -

Date: 2015-11-09T00:00:00

STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED

Date: 2015-11-20T00:00:00

MOTION TO DISMISS FILED

Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

Date: 2015-10-22T00:00:00

NOTICE OF FILING FILED

Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00

RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED

Date: 2015-10-15T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2015-10-01T00:00:00

NOTICE OF FILING FILED

Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00

RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED

Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00

RESTRICTED IMAGE

Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT FILED

Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00

STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -

Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00

RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED

Date: 2015-08-14T00:00:00

EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -

Date: 2015-08-28T00:00:00

AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FILED

Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00

PROTECTIVE ORDER - ALLOWED -

Date: 2015-07-17T00:00:00

MOTION TO DISMISS FILED

Date: 2015-07-10T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT FILED

Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00

STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -

Date: 2015-05-21T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00

COUNTER CLAIM FILED - FEE PAID -

Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2015-03-26T00:00:00

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED

Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00

MOTION SCHEDULED

Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00

STRIKE FROM MOTION CALL - ALLOWED

Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00

RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED

Date: 2015-05-06T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2015-06-12T00:00:00

RESPONSE / REPLY - FILED

Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2015-04-22T00:00:00

MOTION SCHEDULED

Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00

STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -

Date: 2015-03-25T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00

CASE SET ON INDIVIDUAL CALENDAR

Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00

APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -

Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE

Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00

CONTRACT COMPLAINT FILED

Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00

CASE SET ON STATUS CALL

Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2015-03-19T00:00:00

ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT

Date: 2015-03-16T00:00:00

Case Events for True Partner Consulting L v. Andersen Tax Llc , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event DISMISS BY STIPULATION OR AGREEMENT

Judge: GRIFFIN, JOHN C

Docket Event STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -

Judge: GRIFFIN, JOHN C

Docket Event CASE SET ON STATUS CALL - CONTINUED -

Judge: GRIFFIN, JOHN C

Docket Event MOTION FILED
Docket Event EXHIBITS FILED
Docket Event NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Docket Event CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Docket Event MOTION FILED
Docket Event CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Docket Event EXHIBITS FILED
See all events