We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Bcl-Home Rehab Sub 1 Llc Et Al Vs City Chicago Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

Bcl-Home Rehab Sub 1 Llc, Structured Asset Investme, U S Bank N A, filed a(n) case represented by Arnstein & Lehr, Frazier Harry P, against City Chicago, Non Record Claimants, Sanchez Antonio, Sanchez Maria, State Illinois, (total of 8) See All represented by United St Atty Crim, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .

Case Details for Bcl-Home Rehab Sub 1 Llc v. City Chicago , et al.

Filing Date

August 31, 2015

Last Refreshed

February 21, 2021

Filing Location

Cook County, IL

Parties for Bcl-Home Rehab Sub 1 Llc v. City Chicago , et al.

Plaintiffs

Bcl-Home Rehab Sub 1 Llc

Structured Asset Investme

U S Bank N A

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Arnstein & Lehr

Frazier Harry P

Defendants

City Chicago

Non Record Claimants

Sanchez Antonio

Sanchez Maria

State Illinois

United States America

United States Of America

Unknown Owners

Attorneys for Defendants

United St Atty Crim

Case Documents for Bcl-Home Rehab Sub 1 Llc v. City Chicago , et al.

RESTRICTED IMAGE

Date: September 14, 2017

FILED UNDER SEAL

Date: September 14, 2017

MOTION TO - CONTINUED -

Date: October 16, 2017

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: September 14, 2017

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: September 14, 2017

ORDER FOR POSSESSION

Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED

Date: September 14, 2017

ORDER FOR POSSESSION

Date: October 23, 2017

PETITION FILED

Date: September 14, 2017

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: September 14, 2017

LETTER RETURNED FILED

Date: 2016-10-25T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00

MOTION TO - ALLOWED -

Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00

NOTICE FILED

Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00

MOTION TO - ALLOWED -

Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00

SUMMARY JUDGMENT - ALLOWED -

Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00

DEFAULT - ALLOWED -

Date: 2016-02-23T00:00:00

NOTICE FILED

Date: 2017-06-27T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2016-12-30T00:00:00

CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL

Date: 2016-09-30T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00

APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -

Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00

MEMORANDUM OF JUDGEMENT ENTERED

Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00

SUMMARY JUDGMENT - CONTINUED -

Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00

REPORT OF SALE AND DISTRIBUTION

Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00

RECEIPT FILED

Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: 2017-08-09T00:00:00

COMPLY - ALLOWED -

Date: 2017-08-17T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2017-08-03T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00

SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -

Date: 2015-12-22T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2015-12-08T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT FILED

Date: 2015-12-02T00:00:00

NOTICE OF FILING FILED

Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00

NOTICE FILED

Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2015-09-16T00:00:00

CERTIFICATE FILED

Date: 2015-10-13T00:00:00

APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -

Date: 2015-09-11T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00

VERIFIED STATEMENT OF FILING FEE

Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00

CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL

Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED

Date: 2015-09-02T00:00:00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE

Date: 2015-08-31T00:00:00

Case Events for Bcl-Home Rehab Sub 1 Llc v. City Chicago , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event ORDER FOR POSSESSION

Judge: SULLIVAN, WILLIAM B.

Docket Event MOTION TO - CONTINUED -

Judge: SULLIVAN, WILLIAM B.

Docket Event RESTRICTED IMAGE
Docket Event FILED UNDER SEAL
Docket Event NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Docket Event CERTIFICATE FILED
Docket Event CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED
Docket Event PETITION FILED
Docket Event EXHIBITS FILED
Docket Event ***PLACE MORTGAGEE IN POSSESSION(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
See all events