Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pennymac Holdings, filed a(n) case represented by Pierce & Associates, against Capital One Bank, Citizens Community Bank I, Cloud View Llc, Dobobrov Bronco, Fifth Third Bank Western, (total of 10) See All represented by Goodman Adam, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateApril 28, 2015 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Filing LocationCook County, IL |
ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: October 21, 2019STRIKE OR WITHDRAW CNTR-CLM, AMENDED CNTR-CLM OR PORTION THEREOF - ALW -
Date: October 30, 2019ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: September 23, 2019MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: September 04, 2019SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: September 04, 2019SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: July 08, 2019CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-07-08T00:00:00STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -
Date: September 04, 2019MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: August 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00AGREED ORDER ENTERED
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-30T00:00:00MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (SCR 323E) FILED
Date: August 15, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: August 15, 2019***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-06-14T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00AGREED ORDER ENTERED
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00DISMISS, STRIKE OR WITHDRAW A SPECIFIC DEFENDANT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00STRIKE OR WITHDRAW MOTION OR PETITION - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-05-13T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00AGREED ORDER ENTERED
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (SCR 323E) FILED
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-04-29T00:00:00ANSWER AND COUNTER FILED
Date: 2019-02-20T00:00:00MOTION TO DISMISS FILED
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00SECURITY FOR COSTS FILED
Date: 2019-01-17T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-01-28T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2019-03-13T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00VACATE ANY OR ALL DEFAULT ORDERS - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00***DISMISS(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2019-01-11T00:00:00MOTION TO - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00AGREED ORDER ENTERED
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL - ALLOWED
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE WAIVER -
Date: 2018-12-14T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-12-12T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00COMPLY - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2018-05-15T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-02-01T00:00:00***EXTEND TIME FOR FILING(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00***MISC.MOTION(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2018-12-11T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-10-23T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2018-11-20T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2018-07-24T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2018-10-02T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2018-03-06T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00***MISC.MOTION(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2018-01-25T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00CASE SET ON STATUS CALL
Date: 2018-01-11T00:00:00ORDER FOR POSSESSION
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00***EXTEND TIME FOR FILING(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00PETITION TO QUASH FILED
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2017-11-17T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -
Date: 2017-12-27T00:00:00MORTGAGE FORCLOSURE DISPOSED / SHERIFFS SALE APPROVED
Date: 2017-01-17T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-12-20T00:00:00SECURITY FOR COSTS FILED
Date: 2016-12-19T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-10-28T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2016-12-06T00:00:00MOTION TO - CONTINUED -
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00RECEIPT FILED
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2016-11-23T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-11-08T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00REPORT OF SALE AND DISTRIBUTION
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2016-06-24T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-08-12T00:00:00ORDER TO APPOINT SELLING OFFICER - ALLOWED
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ENTERED (CASE IS PENDING)
Date: 2016-06-23T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00***APPROVE SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2016-10-19T00:00:00LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: 2016-05-25T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00SET BRIEFING SCHEDULE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-06-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2016-06-01T00:00:00LETTER RETURNED FILED
Date: 2016-05-18T00:00:00VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL - ALLOWED
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00STRIKE OR VACATE AN ORDER - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00ANSWER/RESPONSE/REPLY
Date: 2016-05-17T00:00:00CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-05-11T00:00:00SUMMARY JUDGMENT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2016-04-21T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE ENTERED (CASE IS PENDING)
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00***VACATE ORDER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00NOTICE OF DEFAULT ORDER MAILED - FEE PAID
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00ORDER TO APPOINT SELLING OFFICER - ALLOWED
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE FILED
Date: 2016-04-27T00:00:00DEFAULT - ALLOWED -
Date: 2016-04-19T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2016-03-17T00:00:00***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00MOTION FILED
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00CASE ELECTRONICALLY FILED
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00EXTEND TIME - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00ANSWER FILED
Date: 2015-10-28T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00MOTION TO - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00NOTICE FILED
Date: 2015-06-19T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -
Date: 2015-09-28T00:00:00STRIKE FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CALL - ALLOWED
Date: 2015-06-29T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2015-09-15T00:00:00***DEFAULT(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00MOTION SCHEDULED (MOTION COUNTER ONLY)
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00***APPT. SELLING OFFICER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00***JUDG. OF FORECLOSURE & SALE(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE OF MAILING NOTICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2015-06-08T00:00:00***APPT. SELLING OFFICER(SET FOR MOTION HEARING)
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2015-06-19T00:00:00FILE APPEARANCE OR JURY DEMAND, ANSWER OR PLEAD - ALLOWED -
Date: 2015-09-30T00:00:00NOTICE OF CHANGE OF OFFICE FILED
Date: 2016-02-25T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00PROOF OF SERVICE FILED
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE FILED
Date: 2016-03-10T00:00:00EXHIBITS FILED
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00NOTICE OF MOTION FILED
Date: 2015-09-10T00:00:00SUMMONS NOT SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00SUMMONS NOT SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00SUMMONS NOT SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00CERTIFICATE FILED
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION FILED
Date: 2015-06-04T00:00:00SUMMONS SERVED BY SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER
Date: 2015-05-28T00:00:00OWNER OCCUPIED SINGLE FAMILY HOME OR CONDOMINIUM - FILED
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00NOTICE OF FILING FILED
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT
Date: 2015-05-20T00:00:00SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER STANDING ORDER-FILED
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00VERIFIED STATEMENT OF FILING FEE
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00AFFIDAVIT AS TO UNKNOWN OWNERS FILED
Date: 2015-04-28T00:00:00For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.