We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Dobrovits Donna J Et Al Vs Bank America Et Al

Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago

Dobrovits Donna J, Lewis Ella J, filed a(n) case represented by Buikema Hiskes & Dillner, against Bank America, Cain Stanley, Edwards Shirley, Estate Of Shirley Edwards, First Fourteen Forty Inve, (total of 11) See All represented by Kozeny & Mccubbin Illinoi, in the jurisdiction of Cook County, IL, . Cook County, IL Superior Courts with Diane J. Larsen presiding.

Case Details for Dobrovits Donna J v. Bank America , et al.

Judge

Diane J. Larsen

Filing Date

February 10, 2015

Last Refreshed

February 21, 2021

Filing Location

Cook County, IL

Parties for Dobrovits Donna J v. Bank America , et al.

Plaintiffs

Dobrovits Donna J

Lewis Ella J

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Buikema Hiskes & Dillner

Defendants

Bank America

Cain Stanley

Edwards Shirley

Estate Of Shirley Edwards

First Fourteen Forty Inve

Gwf Mortgage Corporation

Mighty Carleen

Mighty Shirley

Mighty Yvonne

Non Record Claimants

Unknown Owners

Attorneys for Defendants

Kozeny & Mccubbin Illinoi

Case Documents for Dobrovits Donna J v. Bank America , et al.

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: May 18, 2016

AFFIDAVIT FILED

Date: May 18, 2016

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00

CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -

Date: May 18, 2016

JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF

Date: May 18, 2016

MOTION TO - CONTINUED -

Date: April 15, 2016

CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -

Date: March 17, 2016

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2016-02-18T00:00:00

ADVANCE OR RESET ON CALL

Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00

SUMMONS - RETD P.S.

Date: 2015-02-26T00:00:00

SUMMONS - RETD N.S.

Date: 2015-02-24T00:00:00

CASE SET ON PROGRESS CALL

Date: 2015-12-03T00:00:00

CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -

Date: 2015-10-26T00:00:00

MOTION FILED

Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00

APPEARANCE FILED - NO FEE PAID -

Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00

STRIKE FROM THE CALL - ALLOWED -

Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00

PETITION FOR QUIET TITLE - FILED

Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED

Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00

SUMMONS ISSUED AND RETURNABLE

Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00

AGREED ORDER ENTERED

Date: 2016-01-13T00:00:00

APPOINT SPECIAL DEPUTY - ALLOWED -

Date: 2015-03-11T00:00:00

APPEARANCE FILED - FEE PAID -

Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00

NOTICE FILED

Date: 2015-05-26T00:00:00

CASE SET ON STATUS CALL

Date: 2016-01-05T00:00:00

CASE SET ON STATUS CALL

Date: 2015-06-10T00:00:00

CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -

Date: 2015-08-11T00:00:00

EXECUTE OR PERFORM - ALLOWED -

Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00

NOTICE OF FILING FILED

Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED

Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00

ELECTRONIC NOTICE SENT

Date: 2015-05-01T00:00:00

EXHIBITS FILED

Date: 2016-02-16T00:00:00

SUMMONS - RETD N.S.

Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00

CASE SET ON STATUS CALL

Date: 2015-09-24T00:00:00

SUMMONS - RETD N.S.

Date: 2015-02-17T00:00:00

SUMMONS - RETD N.S.

Date: 2015-02-27T00:00:00

NOTICE OF MOTION FILED

Date: 2015-03-11T00:00:00

SUMMONS - RETD N.S.

Date: 2015-02-20T00:00:00

CASE SET ON CASE MANAGEMENT CALL

Date: 2015-02-10T00:00:00

Case Events for Dobrovits Donna J v. Bank America , et al.

Type Description
Docket Event VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL, NON-SUIT OR DISMISSED BY AGREEMENT

Judge: JACOBIUS, MOSHE

Docket Event COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION OVER THIS MATTER

Judge: JACOBIUS, MOSHE

Docket Event EXHIBITS FILED
Docket Event VACATE JUDGMENT/DISMISSAL - ALLOWED

Judge: LARSEN, DIANE J.

Docket Event AFFIDAVIT FILED
Docket Event CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -

Judge: LARSEN, DIANE J.

Docket Event JUDGMENT FOR PLAINTIFF

Judge: LARSEN, DIANE J.

Docket Event MEMORANDUM OF JUDGEMENT ENTERED

Judge: LARSEN, DIANE J.

Docket Event MOTION TO - CONTINUED -

Judge: LARSEN, DIANE J.

Docket Event CONTINUANCE - ALLOWED -

Judge: LARSEN, DIANE J.

See all events