Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Grays-Jones, Helen, filed a(n) Trusts - Probate case represented by Reid, Anthony K., against Spencer, Sandra, represented by Louie, Calvin S., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with George A. Miram presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGeorge A. Miram Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryTrust |
Time To Trial461 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeTrusts |
|
Stipulation & Order
Date: March 14, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: September 21, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: October 29, 2020Declaration in Opposition
Date: November 10, 2020Reply Filed
Date: November 04, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: November 04, 2020Memorandum of Costs
Date: January 28, 2021Response
Date: February 16, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: October 29, 2020Supplemental
Date: November 12, 2020Supplemental
Date: January 29, 2021Declaration in Support
Date: October 29, 2020Declaration in Support
Date: February 16, 2021Response
Date: January 29, 2018Declaration
Date: November 20, 2018Petition (Probate proceeding not specified) - INITIAL
Date: December 19, 2017Petition (Subsequent)
Date: August 12, 2020Declaration
Date: October 26, 2018Declaration
Date: October 26, 2018Response
Date: January 24, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel
Date: October 26, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: December 05, 2018Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: November 20, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: October 26, 2018Separate Statement
Date: October 26, 2018Declaration in Opposition
Date: September 26, 2018Ex Parte Application
Date: September 26, 2018Order
Date: July 06, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing
Judge: Probate, - |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Response IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE ENFORCEABILITY OF (SIC) SETTLEMENT A Response IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE ENFORCEABILITY OF (SIC) SETTLEMENT AGRRMENT |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support (OF JACK HIRESCH) OF PETITIONER'S REQUEST IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S SUPPL Declaration in Support (OF JACK HIRESCH) OF PETITIONER'S REQUEST IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE ENFORCEABILITY OF (SIC) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PETITIONER'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BR Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PETITIONER'S RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE ENFORCEABILITY OF (SIC) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; DECLARATION OF JACK HIRESCH IN SUPPORT OF PETITIONER'S REQUEST IN OPPOSITION TO RESPONDENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE ENFORCEABILITY OF (SIC) SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; ETC. served on SEE SERVICE LIST |
|
February 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF PETITIONER'S ATTORNEY ANTHONY K. REID FOR ATTORNEY FEES Declaration OF PETITIONER'S ATTORNEY ANTHONY K. REID FOR ATTORNEY FEES |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Supplemental BRIEFING RE ENFORCEABILITY OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT Supplemental BRIEFING RE ENFORCEABILITY OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE ENFORCEABILITY OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT ser Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING RE ENFORCEABILITY OF SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT served on SEE SERVICE LIST |
|
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
~PRO Minute Order - Status Hearing 01/11/2021 Status Hearing ADR Judge: Miram, George A. |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PETITIONER'S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of PETITIONER'S STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.