Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Bankers Standard Insurance Company, Chesler Construction, Inc., Scigliano, Gisela, Townsend, Jeff R, Tt Lee Corporation, A California Corporation, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Baker, Grant H., Millington, Kimberly A., Trevithick, Bruce A., Bush, Kevin D, against Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, Onsite Custom Homes, Townsend, Jeff R, Tt Lee Corporation, represented by Bridgman, Kurt D, Smith, Michael L., Mcneil, Timothy C., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with Marie S. Weiner presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management133 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 20, 2017 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial1209 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
This complaint is filed by Bankers Standard Insurance Company against TT Lee Corporation, Jeff R. Townsend, OnSite Custom Homes, and other unnamed defendants. The complaint alleges that on or about May 2, 2016, water damage occurred at a residential ...
Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 25, 2018Complaint
Date: September 20, 2017Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 19, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: January 17, 2018Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: April 25, 2018Answer
Date: June 06, 2018Amendment to Complaint
Date: October 28, 2019Answer (Unlimited)
Date: July 26, 2018Answer
Date: February 13, 2020Answer
Date: September 07, 2018Answer
Date: February 20, 2020Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: January 22, 2020Answer (Unlimited)
Date: August 13, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: January 25, 2018Amendment to Complaint
Date: November 08, 2019Cross Complaint
Date: May 16, 2018Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: May 16, 2018Summons Cross-Complaint for Civil Division
Date: January 14, 2020Motion for Leave
Date: April 24, 2018Answer
Date: May 16, 2018Amendment to Complaint
Date: March 12, 2020Amendment to Complaint
Date: November 14, 2019Answer
Date: June 15, 2020Notice of Assignment for All Purposes
Date: December 15, 2020Case Management Statement
Date: February 22, 2021Case Management Statement
Date: February 24, 2021Scigliano - Request for Dismissal
Date: January 31, 202255246Reque005bbd
Date: March 24, 2022LA255381. RFD
Date: March 24, 202218Q8654-Dismissal of our Entire Cross-
Date: March 25, 2022Case Management Statement
Date: February 19, 2021Answer
Date: August 31, 2018Cross Complaint
Date: January 14, 2020Cross Complaint
Date: July 26, 2018Cross Complaint
Date: April 25, 2018Answer (Unlimited)
Date: January 14, 2020Motion
Date: March 21, 2018Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: March 05, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2022 | Docket Event | 18Q8654-Dismissal of our Entire Cross- | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | 55246Reque005bbd | |
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event | LA255381. RFD | |
January 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Scigliano - Request for Dismissal | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Conference PER ORDER FILED ON 11/13/20 Judge: Weiner, Marie S. |
|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of CASE MANAGMENT STATEMENT Proof of Service - ELECTRONIC of CASE MANAGMENT STATEMENT |
|
February 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL time estimate 5 days.
Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.