Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
White, Patrick, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Katofsky, Alex P, against Does 1 - 10, Inclusive, Dtrs Palo Alto, Llc, Four Seasons Hotels Limited, A Canada Corporation, Shr Palo Alto, Llc, Strategic Hotels & Resorts, Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company, (total of 5) See All represented by Ellis, Steven A., Tagvoryan, Ana, in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts with V. Raymond Swope presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management125 days |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2017 |
CategoryCivil |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions314 days |
|
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
||
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time40 days |
This complaint is a class action complaint filed by Plaintiff Patrick White against Defendants Strategic Hotels & Resorts, LLC and Four Seasons Hotels Limited. The complaint alleges that the Defendants violated the Fair and Accurate Credit Transactio...
Amendment to Complaint
Date: November 22, 2017Stipulation & Order
Date: December 18, 2017Demurrer to
Date: January 09, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 13, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: January 09, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 14, 2018Declaration
Date: January 09, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: February 13, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: February 08, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 15, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 21, 2018Order
Date: May 24, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: March 22, 2018Complaint
Date: July 14, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: June 26, 2018Order
Date: May 24, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: June 27, 2018Case Management Statement
Date: June 28, 2018Second Amended Complaint
Date: June 13, 2018Demurrer to
Date: July 18, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: July 18, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: July 18, 2018Opposition
Date: August 02, 2018Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: February 07, 2020Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition
Date: August 08, 2018Demurrer to
Date: January 09, 2018Opposition
Date: August 02, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: July 05, 2019Supplemental
Date: February 26, 2018Defendant's Brief re:
Date: July 05, 2019Ex Parte Application
Date: August 02, 2018Amendment to Complaint Order
Date: June 14, 2018Demurrer to
Date: July 18, 2018Notice
Date: August 15, 2018Demurrer to
Date: July 05, 2019Stipulation & Order
Date: February 07, 2018Opposition
Date: February 06, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: August 14, 2018Notice
Date: August 01, 2018Notice
Date: October 23, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: September 21, 2018Declaration in Support
Date: July 18, 2018Judgment of Dismissal
Date: January 28, 2020Order
Date: November 17, 2017Supplemental
Date: February 26, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED IN WHITE V. STRATEG Judgment of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED IN WHITE V. STRATEGIC HOTELS & RESORTS, LLC, ET AL. |
|
November 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Swope, V. Raymond |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Tentative ruling adopted and becomes order: DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS DEMURRER TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. This matter is ordered OFF CALENDAR. This case has previously been assigned to Judge Swope for all purposes. |
|
August 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
~CIV Minute Order - Hearing on Demurrer 08/22/2019 Hearing on Demurrer NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT Judge: Davis, III, Leland |
|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support OF ANJALI MOORTHY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIM Declaration in Support OF ANJALI MOORTHY IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Defendant's Brief re: REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED TO SECOND AM Defendant's Brief re: REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF DEMURRER OF FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Demurrer to NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED TO SECOND AMEND Demurrer to NOTICE OF DEMURRER AND DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
July 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Received SUSTAINING DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED TO SECOND AMEN Proposed Order Received SUSTAINING DEMURRER OF DEFENDANT FOUR SEASONS HOTELS LIMITED TO SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT |
|
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal OF COUNSEL ANJALI MOORTHY Notice of Withdrawal OF COUNSEL ANJALI MOORTHY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.