Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) Civil case in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 2016 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
This complaint is a legal document filed by Whittley Arms Association, a California non-profit mutual benefit corporation, against Stephen H. Pillman. The case is related to breach of contract and is being heard in the Superior Court of the State of ...
Proof of Personal Service
Date: July 16, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 06, 2017(name extension) - PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED
Date: December 01, 2016Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: March 07, 2018Proof of Service by Mail
Date: June 19, 2018Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail
Date: February 06, 2020Motion re: (name extension)
Date: January 24, 2017Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
Date: March 07, 2018Opposition (name extension) - to the motion for judgment on the pleadings
Date: March 23, 2018Reply (name extension) - in support of motion for judgment on the pleadings
Date: March 29, 2018Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings)
Date: April 03, 2018Opposition (name extension) - to Defendant's Motion for New Trial
Date: July 16, 2018Motion for Attorney Fees - Motion for Attorney Fees
Date: December 05, 2019Motion to Tax Costs - Motion to Tax Costs
Date: December 26, 2019Complaint - Breach of Contract
Date: October 24, 2016Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)
Date: April 16, 2018Opposition (name extension) - to plaintiff's verified complaint
Date: April 16, 2018For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.