Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mohammadi, Farhan, Mohammadi, Reza, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Dobbins, Jeremy M., against City Of Fresno, Matson, Larry, Wallace, Steve, represented by Jeffcoach, Mandy L., O'Rourke, Sean T., in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Cullers, Mark presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management127 days |
|
Filing DateJune 06, 2016 |
Category23 Unlimited - Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial1162 days |
Last RefreshedDecember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions645 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
This complaint document contains a lot of noise and invalid text from the extraction process. It is difficult to summarize the text accurately as it does not provide any meaningful information.
Appellant Notice Designating Record - CTX, RTX
Date: October 08, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 18, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 29, 2021Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed
Date: August 27, 2020Letter Received
Date: January 29, 2021Opposition filed
Date: January 06, 2021Order Granted
Date: January 07, 2021Notice of Motion
Date: April 12, 2021Ex parte Filed
Date: May 11, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: April 12, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: May 11, 2021Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: May 11, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 13, 2021Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: January 06, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 06, 2021Order Granted
Date: July 29, 2021Request for Refund Received - Pending Review
Date: May 26, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: August 18, 2021Ex parte Filed
Date: August 18, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 19, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 20, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 10, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 16, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 14, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 15, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 21, 2021Statement filed
Date: September 21, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 20, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: September 17, 2021Memorandum of Costs filed
Date: October 13, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 29, 2021Stipulation and Order filed
Date: October 18, 2021Memorandum of Costs filed
Date: October 21, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 10, 2021Civil case cover sheet
Date: June 06, 2016Civil Complaint filed
Date: June 06, 2016Notice of Hearing
Date: June 06, 2016Summons issued and filed
Date: June 06, 2016Order filed
Date: March 13, 2018Proof of Service
Date: October 06, 2017Amended Document Filed
Date: November 02, 2017Answer Filed
Date: December 19, 2017Proof of Service
Date: December 21, 2017Proof of Service
Date: October 17, 2017Proof of Service
Date: June 11, 2018Deposit, payment,disbursment
Date: April 23, 2018Proof of Service
Date: June 12, 2018Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 25, 2019Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 20, 2019Proof of Service
Date: September 07, 2017Declaration Filed
Date: February 22, 2018Notice of Hearing
Date: January 22, 2018Amended Document Filed
Date: September 27, 2017Notice Filed
Date: February 21, 2018Amended Document Filed
Date: August 02, 2017Proof of Service
Date: April 12, 2021Proof of Service
Date: July 19, 2019Amended Document Filed
Date: November 02, 2017Proof of Service
Date: August 29, 2017Notice Filed
Date: August 02, 2021Answer Filed
Date: March 28, 2018Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter
Date: July 23, 2019Notice Filed
Date: April 26, 2018Notice Filed
Date: August 09, 2018Deposit, payment,disbursment
Date: April 23, 2018Declaration Filed
Date: February 28, 2018Request for Refund Received - Pending Review
Date: May 01, 2018Letter of Documents Returned Without Filing
Date: October 23, 2019Notice Filed
Date: September 17, 2019Notice Filed
Date: May 22, 2019Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: July 22, 2021Notice Filed
Date: February 05, 2019Pursuant to CCP 170.1 - Judge Disqualifies Self
Date: May 22, 2019Notice of Hearing
Date: July 17, 2019Notice Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Minute Order Corrected/Amended
Date: September 21, 2021Special Verdict filed
Date: September 21, 2021Consent to Confer filed
Date: July 10, 2019Witness List filed in Court
Date: September 21, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: August 26, 2019Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter
Date: September 17, 2019Proof of Service
Date: June 14, 2019Notice Filed
Date: June 21, 2019Letter Received
Date: July 14, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: July 06, 2020Declaration Filed
Date: August 05, 2020Clerk's Certificate of Mailing
Date: July 29, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 03, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: November 17, 2020Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Witness List filed in Court
Date: September 21, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: December 23, 2020Proof of Service
Date: May 11, 2021Trial brief filed
Date: September 13, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 01, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Jury Fees Collected
Date: October 04, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order Corrected/Amended
Date: September 20, 2021Notice Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Proposed Document filed
Date: September 13, 2021Proposed Document filed
Date: September 13, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Opposition filed
Date: September 13, 2021Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order Corrected/Amended
Date: September 13, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Minute Order Corrected/Amended
Date: September 14, 2021Document filed
Date: September 17, 2021Minute Order Corrected/Amended
Date: September 15, 2021Minute Order Corrected/Amended
Date: September 16, 2021Notice of Intent/Motion for New Trial
Date: October 26, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Minute Order Corrected/Amended
Date: September 17, 2021Jury Fees Collected
Date: October 07, 2021Ex parte Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter
Date: December 02, 2021Reply filed
Date: November 23, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 03, 2021Notice of Appeal Filed - Civil
Date: December 07, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 02, 2021Order filed
Date: December 02, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: January 11, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: January 12, 2022Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: March 03, 2022Opposition filed
Date: January 21, 2022Appellant Notice Designating Record - CTX, RTX
Date: January 11, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 15, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 19, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: June 14, 2019Memorandum of Costs filed
Date: October 21, 2021Request Filed
Date: May 04, 2022Opposition filed
Date: May 04, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 10, 2022Reply filed
Date: May 05, 2022Notice of Appeal Filed - Civil
Date: December 07, 2021Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 11, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 13, 2022Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 12, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: January 21, 2022Reply filed
Date: February 09, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 04, 2019Opposition filed
Date: November 15, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: May 11, 2021Opposition filed
Date: November 15, 2021Jury Instructions
Date: September 21, 2021Objection filed
Date: September 16, 2021List filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Request for Judicial Notice
Date: September 13, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 13, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 21, 2020Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 25, 2019Declaration Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: July 19, 2021Notice Filed
Date: September 13, 2021List filed
Date: September 13, 2021Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: March 14, 2018Notice Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Commission To Take Deposition Outside California
Date: August 10, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: September 25, 2017Motion filed
Date: November 05, 2021Motion filed
Date: November 05, 2021Opposition filed
Date: November 03, 2021Order Received for Signature
Date: October 14, 2021Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: October 11, 2021Judgment Received
Date: October 01, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Objection filed
Date: September 13, 2021Motion in Limine filed
Date: September 13, 2021Trial brief filed
Date: September 13, 2021Objection filed
Date: September 13, 2021Opposition filed
Date: August 18, 2021Opposition filed
Date: May 12, 2021Request Filed
Date: July 19, 2019Reply filed
Date: September 10, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 17, 2023Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 13, 2022Notice Filed
Date: August 15, 2022Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: September 04, 2019Reply filed
Date: September 10, 2019Ex parte Filed
Date: May 22, 2019Ex parte Filed
Date: July 23, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 26, 2020Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 29, 2019Respondent Notice Designating Record - CTX, RTX
Date: October 10, 2019Respondent Notice Designating Record - CTX only
Date: October 10, 2019Minute Order Attachment (Tentative Rulings Only)
Date: September 17, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 23, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: July 23, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: July 19, 2019Notice Filed
Date: July 19, 2019Ex parte Filed
Date: July 19, 2019Notice of Settlement filed
Date: July 15, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 10, 2019Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: June 14, 2019Ex parte Filed
Date: June 14, 2019Minute Order Attachment
Date: May 23, 2019Order Received for Signature
Date: May 22, 2019Ex parte Filed
Date: May 22, 2019Opposition to Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: August 06, 2018Request for Pre-Trial Discovery filed
Date: July 23, 2018ADR Stipulation Mediation filed
Date: May 30, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 23, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 05, 2018Opposition filed
Date: March 07, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: March 06, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: March 01, 2018Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: February 28, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: February 28, 2018Ex parte Filed
Date: February 28, 2018Reply filed
Date: February 28, 2018Opposition filed
Date: February 22, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 01, 2018Summons issued and filed
Date: December 01, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: November 02, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: August 31, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: June 26, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: April 24, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: February 21, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 19, 2016Minute Order Attachment
Date: October 11, 2016Declaration Filed
Date: September 10, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Status
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Attached |
|
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment and Clerk's Certificate of Mailing |
|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Case Status
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Calendar setting rescheduling 08/18/22 to 12/15/22 |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment with order after hearing and certificate of mailing |
|
May 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Chambers Work- Pre
Judge: Tharpe, D Tyler |
|
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order Attachment with certificate of mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.