Case Last Refreshed: 5 days ago
Toerpe, Lanae, Toerpe, Matthew, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Hansen, Zachariah D., against Does 1 Through 100, Rudolph And Sletten, Inc., Shollenbarger - Borello, Inc., represented by Bogdan, William A., in the jurisdiction of San Mateo County. This case was filed in San Mateo County Superior Courts Superior with DuBois, Richard H. presiding.
Case Number |
Time To Management131 days |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2016 |
Category(23) Unlimited Other Pi/Pd/Wd |
Time To Trial535 days |
Last RefreshedApril 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions446 days |
Filing LocationSan Mateo County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time446 days |
This complaint is a personal injury lawsuit filed by Matthew Toerpe and Lanae Toerpe against Rudolph and Sletten, Inc. The plaintiffs allege that on June 1, 2016, Matthew Toerpe, who was working as an ironworker at a construction site, suffered serio...
Civil Case Cover Sheet
Date: September 30, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: March 08, 2017Stipulation and Order to ADR
Date: June 09, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: March 23, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: April 27, 2017Complaint
Date: September 30, 2016Case Management Statement
Date: April 12, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: January 24, 2017Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Answer
Date: September 19, 2017Declaration
Date: September 12, 2017Order
Date: October 27, 2017Non-Opposition to
Date: November 03, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 27, 2017Supplemental
Date: December 07, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 20, 2017Motion
Date: December 11, 2017Ex Parte Application
Date: October 27, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 02, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: January 17, 2018Motion to Compel
Date: January 10, 2018Supplemental
Date: November 13, 2017Reset
Date: December 15, 2017Supplemental
Date: November 13, 2017Order
Date: November 30, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: November 17, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: January 03, 2018Further Proceedings
Date: February 28, 2018Objection
Date: March 26, 2018Motion to Compel Further
Date: January 25, 2018Order Denying
Date: April 23, 2018Notice
Date: December 14, 2017Supplemental
Date: December 07, 2017Judgment
Date: December 20, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 30, 2017Opposition
Date: December 28, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: November 30, 2017Separate Statement
Date: December 11, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 27, 2017Case Management Conference
Date: February 08, 2017Proposed Order Received
Date: December 11, 2017Declaration
Date: December 11, 2017Declaration
Date: November 17, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: October 27, 2017Declaration
Date: October 27, 2017Order
Date: October 25, 2017Declaration
Date: October 27, 2017Amended Answer/Response/Denial (No Fee)
Date: September 19, 2017Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial
Date: October 26, 2017Ex Parte Application
Date: October 25, 2017Declaration
Date: October 19, 2017Notice
Date: September 20, 2017Memorandum of Points & Authorities
Date: October 19, 2017Declaration
Date: October 19, 2017Proposed Order Received
Date: October 19, 2017Objection
Date: October 19, 2017Proposed Order Received
Date: September 14, 2017Court Reporter Fee Not Paid
Date: September 13, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: September 13, 2017Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: September 13, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Reply
Date: September 12, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 06, 2017Declaration
Date: September 06, 2017Order
Date: August 24, 2017Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: August 22, 2017Ex Parte Application
Date: August 24, 2017Declaration
Date: August 22, 2017Points and Authorities
Date: August 22, 2017Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference and Jury Trial
Date: April 27, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: March 14, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: April 17, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: April 18, 2017Answer (Unlimited)
Date: November 22, 2016Notice of Case Management Conference
Date: September 30, 2016Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment
Date: May 08, 2018Judgment
Date: April 19, 2018Notice
Date: March 13, 2018Memorandum of Costs
Date: February 09, 2018Objection
Date: October 27, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: August 21, 2017Answer (Unlimited)
Date: April 05, 2017Summons Issued / Filed
Date: September 30, 2016Declaration
Date: March 26, 2018Order After Hearing
Date: January 17, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion (No Fee)
Date: December 11, 2017Declaration
Date: October 25, 2017Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: August 22, 2017Declaration
Date: March 13, 2018Declaration
Date: August 21, 2017Notice of Mandatory Settlement Conference
Date: February 07, 2018Notice of Entry of Order
Date: January 22, 2018Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to Amend
Date: August 21, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment/Order
Date: December 21, 2017Declaration
Date: December 28, 2017Declaration
Date: April 19, 2018Separate Statement
Date: October 19, 2017Separate Statement of Undisputed Material Facts
Date: October 19, 2017Affidavit of Mailing
Date: December 26, 2017Declaration
Date: September 13, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support
Date: September 13, 2017Case Management Statement
Date: January 27, 2017Request for Judicial Notice
Date: October 19, 2017Amended Proof of Service by
Date: September 05, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2060 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment Fully Satisfied |
|
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Denying | |
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment COURT JUDGMENT Judgment COURT JUDGMENT |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration RE: DEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Declaration RE: DEFENDANT'S WAIVER OF OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment Judge: Karesh, Jonathan E. |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Objection TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Objection TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
Declaration OF WILLIAM A. BOGDAN IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT Declaration OF WILLIAM A. BOGDAN IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT |
|
March 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
JURY TRIAL TIME ESTIMATE 10 DAYS
Judge: Etezadi, Susan Irene |
|
March 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Settlement Conference
Judge: Foiles, Robert D |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.