Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Lyons, James M., Poet Llc, filed a(n) 02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate case represented by Jones, Timothy, against California Air Resources Board, Corey, Richard, represented by Meckenstock, Margaret E, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Petrucelli, James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2015 |
Category02 Unlimited - Writ Of Mandate |
Last RefreshedDecember 06, 2023 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions805 days |
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time727 days |
Appellant Notice Designating Record - Appendix, RTX
Date: March 27, 2018Ex parte Filed
Date: November 17, 2017Request for Judical Notice
Date: September 07, 2016Trial brief filed
Date: November 14, 2016Request Filed
Date: December 14, 2017Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: February 07, 2018Request Filed
Date: November 20, 2017Notice Filed
Date: January 09, 2018Request Filed
Date: November 14, 2016Request Filed
Date: July 06, 2017Notice Filed
Date: March 02, 2017Order Received for Signature
Date: February 10, 2017Trial brief filed
Date: September 07, 2016Notice Filed
Date: August 04, 2016Request Filed
Date: December 08, 2017Amended Document Filed
Date: July 19, 2016Request Filed
Date: November 29, 2017Stipulation and Order filed
Date: April 14, 2016Request for Dismissal Received - Pending Review
Date: October 26, 2017Judgment Received
Date: January 12, 2018Minute Order Attachment
Date: December 21, 2017Request Filed
Date: December 19, 2016Reply filed
Date: December 14, 2017Objection filed
Date: December 08, 2017Reply filed
Date: December 19, 2016Order Received for Signature
Date: November 17, 2017Notice of Appeal Filed - Civil
Date: March 06, 2018Order Received for Signature
Date: July 05, 2017Ex parte Filed
Date: July 05, 2017Minute Order Attachment
Date: July 06, 2017Response filed
Date: July 06, 2017Stipulation and Order filed
Date: November 07, 2016Stipulation and Order filed
Date: January 07, 2016Notice Filed
Date: November 17, 2016Opposition filed
Date: November 14, 2016Order Received for Signature
Date: July 18, 2016Stipulation and Order filed
Date: June 26, 2016Order Received for Signature
Date: November 04, 2016Stipulation and Order filed
Date: July 19, 2016Stipulation and Order filed
Date: June 26, 2016Stipulation and Order filed
Date: February 25, 2016Opposition filed
Date: December 14, 2017Notice of Motion
Date: December 08, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: December 08, 2017Objection filed
Date: December 07, 2017Opposition filed
Date: December 08, 2017Request Filed
Date: November 21, 2017Opposition filed
Date: December 06, 2017Memorandum of Points and Authorities
Date: November 29, 2017Motion filed
Date: November 29, 2017Opposition filed
Date: November 20, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2019 | Docket Event |
Remittitur from the 5th DCA Filed - Civil DCA: F077138 |
|
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Abandonment of Appeal - Civil DCA: F077138 |
|
April 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Civil Appeals Document Mailed: Register of Actions Pursuant to CRC 8.124(a)(2) |
|
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
Amended Document Filed AMENDED Appellant's Notice Designating Record on Appeal, RTX Attached/Appendix |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Appellant's Notice Designating on Appeal Appellant Notice Designating Record - Appendix, RTX Appendix and Reporter's Transcripts |
|
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mediation Notice from 5th DCA - Appeal Reinstated Pursuant to 5th DCA Local Rule 2 |
|
March 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mediation Notice from 5th DCA - Appeal Suspended Pursuant to 5th DCA Local Rule 2 |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Filed - Civil Notice of Appeal |
|
March 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notification of Filing Notice of Appeal - Civil with Clerk's Certificate of Mailing |
|
February 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
Lodged Documents Returned Trial Notebook returned to: Jenn, Eddings Attorney Runner Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.