Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Lightning Fast Finance Inc A California Corporation, filed a(n) Civil case represented by Acevedo Juan Carlos, against Mitchell Laura, in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts with Elaine Lu presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 18, 2015 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLos Angeles County, CA |
|
Declaration Of Ani Tateos; Filed by: (LIGHTNING FAST FINANCE INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2017-03-28T00:00:00Other - summary of case; Filed by: (LIGHTNING FAST FINANCE INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: September 05, 2018Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Order to Show Cause - Hearing Other) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2018-06-13T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by: Clerk
Date: September 05, 2018Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: (LIGHTNING FAST FINANCE INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: 2015-06-18T00:00:00Judgment; Filed by:
Date: 2017-03-29T00:00:00Notice Re: Transfer of Non Collection Hub Case; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2015-08-04T00:00:00Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of ; Filed by: Clerk
Date: 2017-11-09T00:00:00Declaration 585; Filed by: (LIGHTNING FAST FINANCE INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION (Plaintiff)
Date: September 05, 2018; On the Complaint filed by (LIGHTNING FAST FINANCE INC) A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION on
Date: 2018-08-17T00:00:00Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment
Date: March 30, 2017Opposition (name extension) - To Motion
Date: June 28, 2017Minute Order - (Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment)
Date: October 30, 2017Complaint
Date: June 18, 2015For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.