Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Georgia Department Of Human Services, Paulo, Jace, Paulo, Jupiter, The Georgia Department Of Human Services, Ex. Rel.,, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Baun, Julia, against Paulo, Tristan, in the jurisdiction of Lowndes County, GA, . Lowndes County, GA Superior Courts with Gregory A. Voyles presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGregory A. Voyles Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2023 |
CategorySupport Enforcement* |
Last RefreshedApril 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationLowndes County, GA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
This complaint is filed by the Georgia Department of Human Services on behalf of Jupiter Paulo and Jace Paulo against Tristan M Paulo. The complaint seeks recovery of child support for the minor children. The defendant is the parent of the named chil...
Petition/Complaint
Date: November 20, 2023Return Sheriffs Service
Date: December 20, 2023Miscellaneous
Date: November 20, 2023Notice
Date: December 11, 2023Service
Date: December 11, 2023Notice
Date: February 09, 2024Notice
Date: November 20, 2023Acknowledgment
Date: December 13, 2023Service
Date: February 09, 2024Rule NISI
Date: November 20, 2023Summons
Date: November 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Voyles, Gregory A. |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
COURT 4/4/2024 Notice |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
CERTIFCATE OF SERVICE Service |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Hearing
Judge: Cowart, Richard M. |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
Rule NiSi
Judge: Smith, Catherine M. |
|
December 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Paulo, Tristan - Service Return Sheriffs Service Sher Rtn: Tristan Paulo was personally served on 12/19/23 |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Acknowledgment PAULO,TRISTAN M-200030484-COS |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
COURT 2/7/2024 Notice |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
CERTIFCATE OF SERVICE Service |
|
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Sheriff's Return of Service on 12/19/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.