Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Pierce, Rosezena Jennifer, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Banksware, E Noreen, against Williams, Stanley, in the jurisdiction of Gwinnett County, GA, . Gwinnett County, GA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 02, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationGwinnett County, GA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Motion for Reconsideration of Dismissal
Date: March 04, 2022Order - proposed
Date: March 04, 2022ROSEZENA PIERCE v. STANLEY WILLIAMS_Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings_033022
Date: March 30, 2022ROSEZENA PIERCE v. STANLEY WILLIAMS_Plaintiff Affidavit_033022
Date: March 30, 2022Pierce Rosezena_Amended Affidavit on MJP_050522
Date: May 05, 2022Pierce Rosezena_CSA_050522
Date: May 05, 2022Pierce Rosezena_Consent PPP_050522
Date: May 05, 2022Pierce Rosezena_Amended Settlement Agreement_050522
Date: May 05, 2022CSW - Plaintiff
Date: June 28, 202221-A-08594-1.OrderDismissingCaseForWantOfProsecution
Date: March 04, 2022SW Acknowledgment of Service_
Date: March 08, 202221-A-08594-1.OrderOnPlaintiffsMotionForReconsideration
Date: March 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Judgment and Decree | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial
Judge: Hutchinson, George F., III |
|
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Permanent Parenting Plan Order | |
June 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Child Support Addendum | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CSW - Plaintiff | |
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Child Support Worksheet | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Pierce Rosezena_Amended Affidavit on MJP_050522 | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Pierce Rosezena_CSA_050522 | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Pierce Rosezena_Consent PPP_050522 | |
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Pierce Rosezena_Amended Settlement Agreement_050522 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.