Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pappas, Steven, filed a(n) Civil case against Farr, Doreen, represented by Seymour, Philip, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Sterne, Colleen K presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSterne, Colleen K Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Certification and Order re Destruction CCP 1952, Filed
Date: December 18, 2014Request for Judicial Notice, Filed
Date: January 29, 2009Order, Filed
Date: March 11, 2013Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: February 09, 2009Order, Filed
Date: March 11, 2013Brief, Filed
Date: March 16, 2009Motion in Limine, Filed
Date: March 09, 2009Reply, Filed
Date: February 10, 2009Trial Brief, Filed
Date: February 17, 2009Opposition, Filed
Date: February 04, 2009Trial Brief, Filed
Date: February 17, 2009Memorandum of Points & Authorities, Filed
Date: January 29, 2009Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: January 20, 2009Opposition, Filed
Date: February 09, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Order, Filed
Date: March 11, 2013Judgment, Filed
Date: March 11, 2013Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 26, 2009Judgment, Filed
Date: March 30, 2009Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 16, 2009Objection, Filed
Date: March 25, 2009Brief, Filed
Date: March 16, 2009Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 12, 2009Minute Order, Filed
Date: March 11, 2009Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 24, 2009Trial Brief, Filed
Date: March 09, 2009Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 17, 2009Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 25, 2009Objection, Filed
Date: February 17, 2009Stipulation, Filed
Date: February 11, 2009Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 11, 2009Stipulation, Filed
Date: February 11, 2009Minute Order, Filed
Date: February 09, 2009Response, Filed
Date: February 09, 2009Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: February 09, 2009Order, Filed
Date: February 09, 2009Declaration re: Ex Parte Notice, Filed
Date: February 09, 2009Ex Parte Application, Filed
Date: February 09, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Subpoena
Date: February 04, 2009Stipulation & Order, Filed
Date: January 20, 2009Order, Filed
Date: January 22, 2009Order, Filed
Date: January 20, 2009Notice of Motion, Filed
Date: January 29, 2009Order, Filed
Date: January 12, 2009Subpoena
Date: January 13, 2009Petition, Filed
Date: January 07, 2009Answer to Complaint, Filed
Date: January 12, 2009Petition, Filed
Date: December 31, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Certification and Order re Destruction CCP 1952, Filed of Exhibits, Filed; |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt, Filed for Release of Plaintiff's Exhibits 103-114, Filed; |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt, Filed for Release of Plaintiff's Exhibits 115-126, Filed; |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt, Filed for Release of Plaintiff's Exhibits 76-102, Filed; |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt, Filed for Release of Plaintiff's Exhibits 43-53, Filed; |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt, Filed for Release of Plaintiff's Exhibits 1 - 12, Filed; |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Receipt, Filed for Release of Plaintiff's Exhibits 13-36, Filed; |
|
September 29, 2014 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Ex Parte Exhibit: Civil Destruction
Judge: Judge, No Assigned |
|
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Destruction of Exhibits Depositions and or, Filed; Administrative Record - CCP 1952; |
|
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Ex Parte Exhibit: Civil Pending Case
Judge: Judge, No Assigned |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.