Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Justin, Clifton, filed a(n) Circuit Civil 3-C case represented by Jaffe, Martin J, against Howies, Hungry, in the jurisdiction of Wakulla County, FL, . Wakulla County, FL Superior Courts with SMITH, J LAYNE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedSeptember 25, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationWakulla County, FL |
|
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 21, 2023MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE
Date: June 12, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2023Order GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE
Date: July 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Order GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE | |
July 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Judge: SMITH , J LAYNE Assigned | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Attorney: for to Clifton Justin | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number MX 9674 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Case 652023CA000351CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 3/21/2023 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00 | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 21, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.