Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Ernestine Hardy, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case represented by Jonathan I Rotstein, against Geico General Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Volusia County. This case was filed in Volusia County Superior Courts City Island Courthouse.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationVolusia County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCity Island Courthouse |
Case Outcome TypeAfter Hearing - Other |
to Ernestine Hardy by GEICO General Insurance Company
Date: September 04, 2018Ernestine Hardy to req to produce
Date: October 05, 2018w/prej by Ernestine Hardy Instrument: 2018235757 Book: 7626 Page: 1009 View: 2018235757
Date: November 20, 2018Geico General Ins Co to req for admissions
Date: October 11, 2018Ernestine Hardy
Date: September 13, 2018Ernestine Hardy to req for admissions
Date: September 13, 2018to Geico General Ins Co by Ernestine Hardy
Date: September 13, 2018by Ernestine Hardy
Date: October 18, 2018by Ernestine Hardy
Date: November 06, 2018equitable distribution of settlement proceeds
Date: November 15, 2018dfts answers to interrogs by Ernestine Hardy
Date: November 13, 2018settlement statement by Ernestine Hardy
Date: November 14, 2018answers to interrogs by Ernestine Hardy
Date: October 05, 2018Jonathan I Rotstein
Date: September 13, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | w/prej by Ernestine Hardy Instrument: 2018235757 Book: 7626 Page: 1009 View: 2018235757 | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | equitable distribution of settlement proceeds | |
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
November 14, 2018 | Docket Event | settlement statement by Ernestine Hardy | |
November 13, 2018 | Docket Event | dfts answers to interrogs by Ernestine Hardy | |
November 07, 2018 | Docket Event | ||
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event | by Ernestine Hardy | |
October 18, 2018 | Docket Event | by Ernestine Hardy | |
October 11, 2018 | Docket Event | Geico General Ins Co to req for admissions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.