Case Last Refreshed: 23 hours ago
Riley, Judy, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Cremeens, Patrick, against Kia Motors America Inc, represented by Niznik, Justin, in the jurisdiction of Sarasota County. This case was filed in Sarasota County Superior Courts Circuit with CARROLL, HUNTER W presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2016 |
CategoryContract And Indebtedness - Circuit 2010 |
Last RefreshedMay 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSarasota County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
I'm sorry, but I cannot see the text you provided. Could you please provide the text so that I can summarize it for you?
NOTICE OF SERVICE - OFFER OF JUDGMENT/PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: October 10, 2018EVIDENCE RECORD - #43410 - JOINT
Date: April 18, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: November 05, 2018COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: November 19, 2018CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM BOWMAN AND BROOKE LLP
Date: April 29, 2019ORDER - DENYING MOTION SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 19, 2018COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: April 18, 2019MOTION - FOR NEW TRIAL
Date: April 26, 2019COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: November 26, 2019NOTICE - OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME
Date: October 12, 2019ADDRESS CHANGE - AND NAME CHANGE
Date: September 09, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING - RE-NOTICE
Date: October 10, 2019MOTION - DETERMINE THE AMOUNT OF TAXABLE COSTS
Date: February 17, 2020ORDER - DETERMINE AMOUNT OF TAXABLE COSTS
Date: April 30, 2020CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM JUSTIN D NIZNIK ESQ
Date: April 30, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 11, 2020VERDICT FORM
Date: April 18, 2019JUDGMENT - RECORDED - Recorded (OR. / 2019054291)
Date: April 29, 2019ORDER - DENYING ATTORNEY FEES AND GRANTING COSTS
Date: November 26, 2019NOTICE OF FILING - DEPOSITION
Date: September 27, 2018DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 25, 2017DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 25, 2017DEFENDANT'S SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: March 29, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 02, 2016PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2016120750
Date: December 02, 2016COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: November 01, 2018DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES
Date: April 13, 2017ORDER SETTING TRIAL - AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: April 24, 2018COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: December 03, 2018LIST- EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 04, 2018NOTICE - SERVICE OF OFFER OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: April 18, 2018NOTICE - SERVICE OF EXPERT INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 08, 2018MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFFS PROPERLY IDENTIFIED TRIAL EXHIBITS
Date: November 08, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 08, 2018NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - EMERGENCY HEARING
Date: October 17, 2018NOTICE OF FILING - DEPOSITION OF ANTHONY VASIL AND EXHIBITS
Date: November 13, 2018JURY QUESTIONS
Date: April 18, 2019COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: April 16, 2019RESPONSE- IN OPPISITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS
Date: November 22, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 30, 2019STIPULATION - JOINT PRE-TRIAL (E-FILED AND ACCEPTED INTO WRONG CASE)
Date: January 10, 2019NOTICE - MEDIATION
Date: July 18, 2018COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: November 20, 2018ORDER - PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: January 07, 2019RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 15, 2018MOTION - FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 19, 2018JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: April 18, 2019NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED VERDICT FORM
Date: November 19, 2018DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR DIRECTED VERDICT AT THE CLOSE OF PLAINTIFF'S EVIDENCE
Date: April 16, 2019NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - HEARING
Date: August 30, 2019COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: April 21, 2020JUDGMENT - RECORDED - AMENDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020056852)
Date: April 30, 2020ANSWER/DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - DEFENDANTS
Date: January 05, 2017ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: December 03, 2018OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS
Date: November 30, 2018PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 21, 2017MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF VEHICLE INSPECTION
Date: April 07, 2017NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTION AND VERDICT FORM
Date: November 19, 2018DEFENDANT NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES
Date: September 13, 2018EVIDENCE RECORD - #43412 - DEFENDANT
Date: April 18, 2019ORDER FOR CASE MANAGEMENT
Date: March 14, 2018PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER
Date: November 01, 2018ORDER SETTING TRIAL
Date: April 04, 2019EVIDENCE RECORD - #43415 - DEFENDANT
Date: April 18, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 04, 2018NOTICE OF CANCELLATION - DEPOSITION
Date: October 17, 2018NOTICE OF FILING - DEFENDANT'S TRIAL BRIEF
Date: March 19, 2019REPORT - MEDIATOR
Date: September 10, 2018MOTION - COMPEL RESPONSES
Date: September 21, 2018COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: April 15, 2019RESPONSE - MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: September 28, 2018MOTION - SANCTIONS
Date: December 12, 2018LIST- EXPERT WITNESSES AND FACT WITNESSES WITH TECHNICAL EXPERTISE
Date: September 04, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING - RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 28, 2018PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT
Date: March 15, 2017ORDER SETTING TRIAL - AND REFERRAL TO MEDIATION
Date: January 29, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 26, 2018MOTION - PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: October 16, 2018NOTICE - JURY TRIAL INFORMATION STATMENT
Date: April 01, 2019DEFENDANT NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: October 17, 2018TRIAL BRIEF - PLAINTIFF
Date: December 03, 2018AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: September 19, 2017NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF CASEY D BREEN AND CHRISTOPHER A COOLEY
Date: November 08, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION - THIRD
Date: September 28, 2018ORDER FROM DOCKET SOUNDING
Date: November 20, 2018MOTION - CONTINUE TRIAL
Date: January 25, 2019NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: August 22, 2017COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: April 02, 2019MOTION - IN LIMINE - TO PRECLUDE AS HEARSAY
Date: October 08, 2018COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: January 29, 2019PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: March 15, 2017NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: October 09, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION
Date: October 03, 2018COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND
Date: December 02, 2016PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: March 21, 2017SUBPOENA RETURNED - DEFENDANT KIA MOTORS AMERICA INCS NOTICE OF FILING
Date: July 19, 2017PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF READINESS & MOTION TO SET ORIGINAL ACTION FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: July 26, 2017MOTION - TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S SECOND DEPOSITION
Date: November 12, 2018NOTICE - SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 21, 2018MOTION - FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: October 16, 2018MOTION - IN LIMINE - REQUESTING
Date: October 04, 2018EVIDENCE RECORD - #43416 - DEFENDANT
Date: April 18, 2019CHART - JURY SEATING
Date: April 18, 2019NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED
Date: April 09, 2020EVIDENCE RECORD - #43414 - DEFENDANT
Date: April 18, 2019PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 21, 2017EVIDENCE RECORD - #43409 - JOINT
Date: April 18, 2019COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: April 24, 2018ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 19, 2018AMENDED SECOND NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM
Date: September 26, 2017COURT APPEARANCE RECORD
Date: October 30, 2018SUMMONS CIRCUIT EFILED - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE - KIA MOTORS AMERICA INC - ISSUED ON 12/02/16
Date: December 02, 2016PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO DEFENDANT
Date: March 15, 2017LIST- LIST OF WITNESSES
Date: September 04, 2018MOTION TO RESERVE EVIDENCE - DEFENDANTS
Date: January 05, 2017RESPONSE - IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: November 02, 2018NOTICE OF FILING - DEPOSITION OF CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE OF VENICE TOYOTA TAKEN 11/01/2018
Date: November 16, 2018REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 21, 2018DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: April 13, 2017PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 03, 2017WITNESS LIST
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: September 21, 2018RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION IN LIMINE - DEFENDANT
Date: October 18, 2018OBJECTION TO DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: November 19, 2018OBJECTION - TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST
Date: November 16, 2018LIST - AMENDED WITNESSES
Date: November 16, 2018NOTICE OF HEARING- EMERGENCY
Date: October 17, 2018LIST - AMENDED EXHIBIT
Date: November 16, 2018NOTICE - JURY INSTRUCTIONS PROPOSED
Date: November 19, 2018LIST - STIPULATED EXHIBIT
Date: November 16, 2018CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY - DEFENDANTS
Date: August 28, 2018EVIDENCE RECORD - #43411 - PLAINTIFF
Date: April 18, 2019MOTION - FOR SANCTIONS FOR FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH ORDER
Date: September 19, 2018RESPONSES - THIRD REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: October 26, 2018EVIDENCE RECORD - #43413 - DEFENDANT
Date: April 18, 2019EXHIBIT LIST
Date: September 20, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: January 25, 2017ORDER - DENYING MOTION NEW TRIAL
Date: April 29, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER - DETERMINE AMOUNT OF TAXABLE COSTS | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CORRESPONDENCE - JUDGE - PUBLIC - FROM JUSTIN D NIZNIK ESQ | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - RECORDED - AMENDED - Recorded (OR. / 2020056852) | |
April 21, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING - AMENDED | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT SET EVENT: MOTIONS DATE: Apr 20 2020 3:30PM JUDGE: CARROLL, HUNTER W LOCATION: JACS | |
February 17, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION - DETERMINE THE AMOUNT OF TAXABLE COSTS | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | COURT APPEARANCE RECORD | |
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER - DENYING ATTORNEY FEES AND GRANTING COSTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.