Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
filed a(n) case against Bonfiglio, Danielle, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with ROBY, WILLIAM L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 11, 2022 |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
|
ARREST REPORT - INITIATING CASE
Date: February 11, 2022BOND RECEIVED
Date: February 11, 2022DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: February 16, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 16, 2022WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT AND WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY
Date: February 16, 2022NO INFORMATION
Date: February 28, 2022INFORMATION
Date: February 28, 2022NOTICE OF COURT DATE
Date: March 01, 2022DEFENDANT'S RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY
Date: March 01, 2022CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND
Date: March 01, 2022DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI
Date: March 07, 2022WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF APPEARANCE | |
March 07, 2022 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S RECIPROCAL DISCOVERY | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CANCELLATION OF BOND | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DOCKET CALL - PRI ATTY SET FOR 04/19/2022 AT 1:30 PM IN 2B/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: ROBY, WILLIAM L | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | PROSECUTOR: MILLER, JUSTIN THOMAS ASSIGNED | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: OHLE, MICHAEL ROBERT - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022CF000348 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BONFIGLIO, DANIELLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: IF-2/28/2022" | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: OHLE, MICHAEL ROBERT; HILBURN, PATRICK - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2022CF000348 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BONFIGLIO, DANIELLE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-3/1/2022" | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | SURETY BOND AS51423759 (414.39.5B) RELEASED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.