Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Farach, Paige Meredith, against Hiers, Randal Lee, represented by Arrieta, Manuel Eduardo, Bucchi, Adrienne M, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with HENDRIKS, JEFFREY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHENDRIKS, JEFFREY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedSeptember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDER ALLOWING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL ( V )
Date: February 09, 2021DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )
Date: March 08, 2021MOTION TO WITHDRAW ( V )
Date: February 04, 2021NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )
Date: February 01, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: TRIAL DOCKET: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, WITH PRIVATE ATTORNEY ADRIENNE M. BUCCHI, ASA PAIGE M. FARACH WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. CONTINUED FOR: CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING: NEXT COURT DATE: 8/23/2021 09:00 AM WITH JUDGE HENDRIKS J. | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF PLEA HEARING SET FOR 08/23/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY | |
August 17, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: BUCCHI, ADRIENNE M; DEPALMA, JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021MM000179 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. HIERS, RANDAL LEE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-8/17/2021" | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: BUCCHI, ADRIENNE M; DEPALMA, JOSEPH - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT – 2021MM000179 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. HIERS, RANDAL LEE - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: NOCD-7/14/2021" | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | TRIAL DOCKET SET FOR 08/17/2021 AT 9:00 AM IN 1D/ , COUNTY JUDGE: HENDRIKS, JEFFREY | |
July 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT DATE | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | IN-COURT DOCKETING NOTES | |
July 13, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT MINUTES: TRIAL DOCKET: DEFENDANT APPEARED IN OPEN COURT, WITH PRIVATE ATTORNEY ADRIENNE M. BUCCHI, ASA PAIGE M. FARACH WAS PRESENT FOR THE STATE. DEFENSE MOTION TO CONTINUE AND MOTION WAS GRANTED. CONTINUED FOR: TRIAL DOCKET: NEXT COURT DATE: 8/17/2021 09:00 AM WITH JUDGE HENDRIKS J. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.