Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Granada Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Glick, Levi, Kammer, Ronald L, against Morancy, Yves, Rr Treasure Coast Llc, St Louis, Daniel, St. Louis, Samuel Derlin, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with METZGER, ELIZABETH A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMETZGER, ELIZABETH A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 06, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4667.1276 / 4909951) ( V )
Date: August 16, 2021COURT NOTES
Date: August 13, 2021MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: July 09, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING ( V )
Date: July 09, 2021ORDER FOR DEFAULT
Date: August 10, 2020CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2020PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION
Date: March 19, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 21, 2020CORRESPONDENCE
Date: May 15, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: May 15, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING- AMENDED
Date: May 08, 2020NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: April 20, 2020DEFAULT - 2 PARTIES
Date: March 20, 2020MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT
Date: March 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AMENDED - SAMUEL DERLIN ST LOUIS ( V )
Date: February 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AMENDED - DANIEL ST LOUIS ( V )
Date: February 10, 2020NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED ( V )
Date: February 11, 2020NOTICE OF ACTION TO BE ISSUED ( V )
Date: February 11, 2020MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )
Date: January 13, 2020RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS UNSERVED ( V )
Date: February 10, 2020AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH ( V )
Date: February 07, 2020MILITARY/NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT ( V )
Date: February 07, 2020MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT ( V )
Date: January 13, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED ( V )
Date: December 09, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )
Date: December 26, 2019RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS SERVED ( V )
Date: December 19, 2019SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )
Date: December 06, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )
Date: December 06, 2019DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK ( V )
Date: January 13, 2020DEFAULT ( V )
Date: January 14, 2020DEFAULT FOR ENTRY BY CLERK
Date: March 20, 2020COMPLAINT ( V )
Date: December 06, 2019ANSWER RR TREASURE COAST LLC ( V )
Date: January 03, 2020MOTION TO STRIKE ( V )
Date: January 13, 2020ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE ANSWER
Date: May 15, 2020MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( V )
Date: July 08, 2021FINAL JUDGMENT ( V )
Date: August 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney LEVI GLICK - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
September 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Attorney RONALD L KAMMER - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
August 16, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4667.1276 / 4909951) ( V ) | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT ( V ) | |
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ( V ) | |
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING SET FOR 08/13/2021 AT 10:30 AM IN VTR/ , CIRCUIT JUDGE: METZGER, ELIZABETH A | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ( V ) | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DEFAULT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.