Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Perez, Armando, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case against Asi Preferred Insurance Corp, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with BRONIS, BARBARA W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRONIS, BARBARA W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2018 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ( V )
Date: January 22, 2019RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )
Date: December 12, 2018WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST ( V )
Date: October 29, 2018NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )
Date: November 12, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )
Date: November 12, 2018PRE-TRIAL ORDER ( V )
Date: August 28, 2018NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V )
Date: May 02, 2019MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )
Date: December 11, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )
Date: November 15, 2018WITNESS LIST ( V )
Date: November 15, 2018REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )
Date: November 12, 2018NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY ( V )
Date: October 22, 2018REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )
Date: June 08, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )
Date: October 10, 2018PRIVILEGE LOG ( V )
Date: September 07, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )
Date: June 08, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )
Date: September 07, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )
Date: September 07, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V )
Date: September 05, 2018ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )
Date: August 13, 2018MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V )
Date: July 11, 2018NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ( V )
Date: July 11, 2018NOTICE OF TRIAL ( V )
Date: August 17, 2018COMPLAINT ( V )
Date: June 08, 2018CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )
Date: June 08, 2018SUMMONS ISSUED - COURTDOCUMENT@DUBOFFLAWFIRM.COM ( V )
Date: June 12, 2018REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS ( V )
Date: June 08, 2018DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS ( V )
Date: June 08, 2018SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )
Date: June 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney MICHAELA DENISE SCHEIHING - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney KENNETH ROBERT DUBOFF - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ( V ) | |
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 22, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT ( V ) | |
January 02, 2019 | Docket Event | CIRCUIT JUDGE BRONIS, BARBARA W: ASSIGNED | |
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST ADMISSIONS ( V ) | |
December 11, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME ( V ) | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V ) | |
November 15, 2018 | Docket Event | WITNESS LIST ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.