Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Cohen, Alissa R, against Gansert, Robert Randall Jr, represented by Bajger, Jennifer I, Miranda, Ginger A, Public Defender Unknown, in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County. This case was filed in St. Lucie County Superior Courts with SWEET, GARY L presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2017 |
CategoryCriminal Felony |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
ORDER OF DRIVER LICENSE REVOCATION ( V )
Date: October 05, 2018NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )
Date: December 04, 2017NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )
Date: December 12, 2017NOTICE ON DEMAND ( V )
Date: May 21, 2018PROVISIONAL ORDER APPOINTING PUBLIC DEFENDER ( V )
Date: November 29, 2017NOTICE OF RESULT ON APPLICATION FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: December 01, 2017DEMAND FOR NOTICE OF ALIBI ( V )
Date: December 12, 2017EXTRADITION COST MEMO ( V )
Date: August 08, 2018PLEA AGREEMENT ( V )
Date: September 27, 2018JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V )
Date: October 04, 2018ORDER OF PROBATION ( V )
Date: October 05, 2018JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4189.1154 / 4488515) ( V )
Date: October 08, 2018ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4189.2020 / 4488743) ( V )
Date: October 08, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN MAIL ( V ) | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | COLLECTION COURT HEARING SET FOR 10/25/2021 AT 1:30 PM IN M/ , COUNTY JUDGE: ISENHOWER, DARYL | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | REOPENED CASE CLOSED | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE REOPENED FOR COLLECTION COURT | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | "RECIPIENTS: - SUBJECT: SERVICE OF COURT DOCUMENT SAO, DMV– 2017CF003200 A, STATE OF FLORIDA VS. GANSERT, ROBERT RANDALL JR - ATTACHMENT COUNT: 1 - EMAIL DOCKET DESCRIPTIONS: ODLR-10/5/2018" | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4189.1154 / 4488515) ( V ) | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) - Recorded (Other.4189.2020 / 4488743) ( V ) | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DRIVER LICENSE REVOCATION ( V ) | |
October 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF PROBATION ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.