Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cornelison, Joyce, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Heuyes, Kyle, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., in the jurisdiction of St. Lucie County, FL, . St. Lucie County, FL Superior Courts with CROOM, JANET C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCROOM, JANET C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2017 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSt. Lucie County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4189.2900 / 4489041) ( V )
Date: October 09, 2018STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT ( V )
Date: October 08, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )
Date: August 29, 2018REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )
Date: July 25, 2018CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )
Date: August 03, 2018FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V )
Date: October 08, 2018ORDER GRANTING ( V )
Date: July 30, 2018NOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION ( V )
Date: August 29, 2018REQUEST FOR COPIES ( V )
Date: August 07, 2018WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST ( V )
Date: August 22, 2018ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V )
Date: October 08, 2018NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )
Date: August 07, 2018NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ( V )
Date: June 14, 2018NOTICE OF ATTENDING CME AND OBJECTION ( V )
Date: July 25, 2018NOTICE OF COMPULSORY PHYSICAL EXAMINATION - AMENDED ( V )
Date: July 25, 2018WITNESS LIST ( V )
Date: July 19, 2018NOTICE OF COMPULSORY PHYSICAL EXAM ( V )
Date: July 25, 2018REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )
Date: May 09, 2018CERTIFICATE OF NON OBJECTION ( V )
Date: July 24, 2018PRE-TRIAL ORDER ( V )
Date: May 08, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )
Date: February 21, 2018PRIVILEGE LOG - DEFENDANT ( V )
Date: February 21, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )
Date: February 01, 2018NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )
Date: July 25, 2018WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST ( V )
Date: July 19, 2018NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ( V )
Date: July 18, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )
Date: June 26, 2018MOTION IN LIMINE ( V )
Date: May 09, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )
Date: June 26, 2018NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES ( V )
Date: May 09, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES ( V )
Date: January 03, 2018RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )
Date: December 21, 2017NOTICE OF TRIAL ( V )
Date: April 05, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - AMENDED ( V )
Date: February 01, 2018STIPULATION OF CONFIDENTIALITY ( V )
Date: February 27, 2018NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWER TO INTERR ( V )
Date: December 20, 2017RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION ( V )
Date: February 21, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )
Date: January 03, 2018NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V )
Date: December 28, 2017MOTION TO DISMISS ( V )
Date: December 08, 2017REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )
Date: December 08, 2017COMPLAINT ( V )
Date: October 31, 2017NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )
Date: December 08, 2017SUMMONS ISSUED - CHASTINGS@LESSERLAWFIRM.COM
Date: November 01, 2017ANSWER/DEFENSE/DEMAND FOR JURY ( V )
Date: December 08, 2017REQUEST TO PRODUCE ( V )
Date: October 31, 2017CIVIL COVER SHEET ( V )
Date: October 31, 2017NOTICE SERVING INTERROGATORIES ( V )
Date: October 31, 2017SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ( V )
Date: October 31, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney SAMUEL SYDNEY LEWIS - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
September 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Attorney CHAD CHRISTOPHER HASTINGS - Deactivated by Automated Process | |
October 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Recorded (Other.4189.2900 / 4489041) ( V ) | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT ( V ) | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM ( V ) | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL ( V ) | |
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ( V ) | |
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCEL DEPOSITION ( V ) | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LIST ( V ) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.